EP0523503 - Ultra thin polymer film electret and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.1998 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.09.1998 [1998/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | ||
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | ||
Former [1993/03] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mino, Norihisa 4-6-8-806, Senrioka Higashi Settsu-shi, Osaka 566 / JP | 02 /
Yamagata, Yoshikazu 5-22-13, Shoto-ryo, Fujita-cho Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570 / JP | 03 /
Ogawa, Kazufumi 30-5, Higashi Nakafuri 1-chome Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573 / JP | [1993/03] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/03] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92111440.1 | 06.07.1992 | [1993/03] | Priority number, date | JP19910173615 | 15.07.1991 Original published format: JP 17361591 | [1993/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0523503 | Date: | 20.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0523503 | Date: | 16.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0523503 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01G7/02 | [1993/03] | CPC: |
H01G7/023 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/03] | Title | German: | Ultradünner Polymerfilm-Elektret und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1993/03] | English: | Ultra thin polymer film electret and method of manufacturing the same | [1993/03] | French: | Electret sous forme de film de polymère ultra-mince et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1993/03] | Examination procedure | 23.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/16] | 30.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS62221103 ; | [A]DE3039561 (ECOLE POLYTECH [CA]) [A] 1,6 * claim - *; | [A]JPS6410611 ; | [A]JPH01232038 ; | [A]FR2304629 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]); | [PA]EP0452955 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1,2,4-6 * column 2, line 29 - column 3, line 46; figures 1-3 * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 87, no. 44, Database accession no. 87-311235, & JPS62221103 A 19870929 (MATSUSHITA ELEC IND KK) [A] 1,2,4-6 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 08, Database accession no. 89-057910, & JPS6410611 A 19890113 (MARCON ELECTRONICS CO) [A] 3,6 * title * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 43, Database accession no. 89-313601, & JPH01232038 A 19890918 (KURARAY KK) [A] 1,6 * abstract * |