EP0523523 - Anticoccidial compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.1996 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.1996 [1996/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/03] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schildknecht, Eugene George 9 Hillside Road Hackettstown, N.J. 07840 / US | 02 /
Untawale, Govind Gajanan 281 Farmingdale Road Wayne, N.J. 07470 / US | [1993/03] | Representative(s) | Cottong, Norbert A., et al F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department (PLP), 124 Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/03] | Cottong, Norbert A., et al Grenzacherstrasse 124 Postfach 3255 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 92111552.3 | 08.07.1992 | [1993/03] | Priority number, date | US19910731683 | 17.07.1991 Original published format: US 731683 | [1993/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0523523 | Date: | 20.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0523523 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A23K1/17, A61K31/505, A61K31/35 | [1993/03] | CPC: |
A61K31/505 (EP,US);
A23K20/195 (EP,US);
A61P33/02 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/505, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/505, A61K31/35 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1993/03] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzungen gegen Coccidiosis | [1993/03] | English: | Anticoccidial compositions | [1993/03] | French: | Compositions contre la coccidiose | [1993/03] | Examination procedure | 09.07.1992 | Examination requested [1993/03] | 20.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0268135 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [AD]US4839382 (MAESTRONE GIANPAOLO [US], et al) |