EP0512580 - Stabilisation of colour [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.04.1994 [1994/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1992/46] | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 CH-1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kratky, Zdenek 110 Candlewood Lake Road New Milford, CO 06776 / US | 02 /
Vadehra, Dharam Vir 6, Hallets Road New Milford, CN 06776 / US | [1993/11] |
Former [1992/46] | 01 /
Kratky, Zdenek 110 Candlewood Lake Road New Milford, CO 06776 / US | ||
02 /
Vadehra, Dharam Vir 110 Willow Springs New Milford, CO 06776 / US | Representative(s) | Pate, Frederick George, et al 55, Avenue Nestlé 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1992/46] | Pate, Frederick George, et al 55, Avenue Nestlé CH-1800 Vevey / CH | Application number, filing date | 92111653.9 | 12.10.1988 | [1992/46] | Priority number, date | US19870112221 | 22.10.1987 Original published format: US 112221 | [1992/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0512580 | Date: | 11.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A23B7/06, A23B7/154, A23B7/157, A23B7/05, A23B7/022 | [1992/46] | CPC: |
A23B7/05 (EP,US);
A23B7/022 (EP,US);
A23B7/06 (EP,US);
A23B7/10 (EP,US);
A23B7/154 (EP,US);
A23B7/157 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1992/46] | Title | German: | Farbstabilisierung | [1992/46] | English: | Stabilisation of colour | [1992/46] | French: | Stabilisation de couleur | [1992/46] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 09.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/46] | 19.04.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1994/16] | 29.04.1993 | Request for decision received: (all rights) | 09.06.1993 | Result of request for decision ((all rights)): Request rejected | 19.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/16] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP88116909.8 / EP0312899 | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 09.07.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 31.10.1993 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP58067144 ; | [A]JP63248339 ; | [X]US4701330 (ROGERS ANN M [US], et al); | [Y]US3814820 (BUSTA F, et al); | [A]US2531463 (EARL PRYOR DEAN, et al) | [X] - WORLD PATENTS INDEX LATEST Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 83-52520K & JP-A-58 067 144 (AIZU TEMPO JOZO), & JP58067144 A 00000000 | [A] - WORLD PATENTS INDEX LATEST Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 88-334626 & JP-A-63 248 339 (IWAI), & JP63248339 A 00000000 |