EP0522576 - Aminoethane-1,1-bisphosphonic acids and aminoethane-1,1-alkylphospinic/phosphonic acids, process of their preparation and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.1995 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.12.1995 [1995/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/02] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lang, Hans-Jochen, Dr. Rüdesheimer Strasse 7 W-6238 Hofheim/Taunus / DE | 02 /
Naumann, Christoph, Dr. Idsteiner Strasse 90 W-6272 Niedernhausen / DE | 03 /
Raiss, Ruth, Dr. Fürstenberger Strasse 1 W-6000 Frankfurt/Main / DE | 04 /
Komiyama, Osamu 3-3-12 Nakano Nakano-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Terui, Yoshiko 1-13-2 Honda Kokubunji, Tokyo / JP | [1993/02] | Application number, filing date | 92111763.6 | 10.07.1992 | [1993/02] | Priority number, date | DE19914123025 | 12.07.1991 Original published format: DE 4123025 | [1993/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0522576 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0522576 | Date: | 14.07.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/38, C07F9/40, C07F9/30, A61K31/66 | [1993/02] | CPC: |
C07F9/3873 (EP,US);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07F9/3821 (EP,US);
C07F9/4012 (EP,US);
C07F9/405 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1993/02] | Title | German: | Substituierte Aminoethan-1,1-bisphosphonsäuren und Aminoethan-1,1-alkylphosphinphosphonsäuren, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und Verwendung derselben | [1993/02] | English: | Aminoethane-1,1-bisphosphonic acids and aminoethane-1,1-alkylphospinic/phosphonic acids, process of their preparation and their use | [1993/02] | French: | Acides aminoéthane-1,1-bisphosphoniques et 1,1-alkylphosphiniques-phosphoniques, procédé de leur préparation et leur utilisation | [1993/02] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 15.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/06] | 11.10.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0325482 (YAMANOUCHI PHARMA CO LTD [JP]); | [XD]EP0407344 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [A]EP0186405 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS (STN online), American Chemical Society 1992, ACCESSION NO. 93(9): 93 361b, I.S. ALFEREY et al. "Immuno- depressive effect of N-substituted 2-aminoethyli- dene-1,1-diphosphonic acids" |