EP0524513 - Aqueous polymer dispersions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.02.1996 [1996/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/04] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grubert, Heinrich, Dr. Hahnbergweg 21/1 W-6900 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
Dersch, Rolf, Dr. Kastanienweg 11c W-6730 Neustadt / DE | 03 /
Neutzner, Josef, Dr. Erschigweg 32 W-6730 Neustadt / DE | 04 /
Hummerich, Rainer, Dr. Grosser Riedweg 17 W-6520 Worms 27 / DE | 05 /
Claassen, Peter Joseph Maria W. Schaapsdrift 116 NL-6902 Al Zevenaar / NL | [1993/04] | Application number, filing date | 92111862.6 | 11.07.1992 | [1993/04] | Priority number, date | DE19914124819 | 26.07.1991 Original published format: DE 4124819 | [1993/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0524513 | Date: | 27.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0524513 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0524513 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08F14/00, C08F2/22, C08F14/06, C08K13/02, C08L27/06 | [1993/31] | CPC: |
C08F14/06 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F14/06, C08F2/22 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1993/04] | C08F14/00, C08F2/22 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, NL [1993/04] | Title | German: | Wässrige Polymerisatdispersionen | [1993/04] | English: | Aqueous polymer dispersions | [1993/04] | French: | Dispersions polymères aqueuses | [1993/04] | Examination procedure | 23.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/38] | 07.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP47046445 ; | [X]GB1570178 (DURHAM CHEM); | [A]FR2316251 (GOODRICH CO B F [US]) | [X] - DATABASE CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS (HOST: STN): CA80(8):37934k, Colombus, Ohio, US; &JP-A-47 046 445( SAKAI KKKK) 22-09-1972, & JP47046445 A 00000000 |