EP0523692 - Method for producing glass preform for optical fiber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 12.02.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.1999 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 31.03.1999 [1999/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LTD 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/03] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LTD 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Danzuka, Toshio, c/o Yokohama Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd., 1, Taya-cho, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Ito, Masumi, c/o Yokohama Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd., 1, Taya-cho, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Tsuchiya, Ichiro, c/o Yokohama Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd., 1, Taya-cho, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1993/03] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/03] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92112148.9 | 16.07.1992 | [1993/03] | Priority number, date | JP19910179814 | 19.07.1991 Original published format: JP 17981491 | JP19920088640 | 09.04.1992 Original published format: JP 8864092 | [1993/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0523692 | Date: | 20.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0523692 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/12] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0523692 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C03B37/014 | [1993/03] | CPC: |
C03B37/0146 (EP,US);
C03B37/02 (KR);
C03B37/01446 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1993/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Vorform für optische Fasern | [1993/03] | English: | Method for producing glass preform for optical fiber | [1993/03] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une préforme pour fibre optique | [1993/03] | Examination procedure | 25.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/29] | 06.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.12.1996
ADMISSIBLE Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, New York 14831 / US Opponent's representative Marchant, James Ian Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [1997/07] | 23.01.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.05.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.07.1998 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 12.07.1998 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 26.10.1998 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 26.01.1999 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2067180 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE, et al); | [X]EP0139532 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 491 (C-554)(3338) 21 December 1988 |