EP0578860 - Device for the transmission of data by telephone line [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.04.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.1999 | Refusal of application | published on 19.05.1999 [1999/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RICOS CO., LTD. 1-1-805, Miyakojima, Minamidori 2-chome Miyakojima-ku Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/03] | For all designated states RICOS CO., LTD. 1-1-805, Miyakojima, Minamidori 2-chome Miyakojima-ku, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsumura, Mihoji 1-1-805, Miyakojima Minamidori 2-chome Miyakojima-ku, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Taniguchi, Shinnosuke 6-24, Higashinakamoto 2-chome, Higashinari-ku Osaka / JP | [1994/03] | Representative(s) | Hering, Hartmut, et al Patentanwälte Berendt, Leyh & Hering Innere Wiener Strasse 20 81667 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/03] | Hering, Hartmut, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Berendt, Leyh & Hering Innere Wiener Strasse 20 D-81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92112268.5 | 17.07.1992 | [1994/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0578860 | Date: | 19.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04M11/08 | [1994/03] | CPC: |
H04M11/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/03] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Übertragung von Daten über eine Telefonleitung | [1994/03] | English: | Device for the transmission of data by telephone line | [1994/03] | French: | Dispositif pour la transmission de données par une ligne téléphonique | [1994/03] | Examination procedure | 18.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/37] | 22.12.1995 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 06.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.1996 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 06.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.12.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1999/20] | 02.01.1999 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1999/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP4151957 ; | [A]EP0199268 ; | [E]JPH04207251 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 435 (E-1263)10 September 1992 & JP-A-4 151 957 ( RIKOSU ) 25 May 1992, & JP4151957 A 19920525 | [Y] - FREQUENZ vol. 36, no. 7/8, 1982, BERLIN DE pages 211 - 216 K. FELLBAUM ET AL. 'Sprachunterstützter Bildschirmtext - Verfahren und Anwendungen' | [A] - REVIEW OF THE ELECTRICAL COMMUNICATION LABORATORIES vol. 33, no. 2, March 1985, TOKYO JP pages 277 - 283 Y. KOBAYASHI ET AL. 'Videotex Terminals for the INS Model System' |