Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
02.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.1996 [1996/38] |
11.08.1995 | (Expected) grant | published on 27.09.1995 [1995/39] |
14.07.1994 | Change - representative | published on 31.08.1994 [1994/35] |
17.12.1993 | First examination report | |
29.07.1993 | Request for examination filed | published on 15.09.1993 [1993/37] |
04.12.1992 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 20.01.1993 [1993/03] |