EP0524625 - Method and apparatus for communicating compressed video using trellis coded QAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL INSTRUMENT CORPORATION 101 Tournament Drive Horsham, PA 19044 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/44] | For all designated states General Instrument Corporation 101 Tournament Drive Horsham, PA 19044 / US | ||
Former [1998/43] | For all designated states NextLevel Systems, Inc. 101 Tournament Drive Horsham, PA 19044 / US | ||
Former [1994/38] | For all designated states GENERAL INSTRUMENT CORPORATION OF DELAWARE 181 West Madison Street Chicago, Illinois 60602 / US | ||
Former [1994/31] | For all designated states GI CORPORATION 2200 Byberry Road Hatboro, Pennsylvania 19040 / US | ||
Former [1993/04] | For all designated states GENERAL INSTRUMENT CORPORATION 2200 Byberry Road Hatboro, Pennsylvania 19040 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paik, Woo H. 3470 Fortuna Ranch Road Encinitas, California 92024 / US | 02 /
Lery, Scott A. 1183 Hymettus Avenue Leucadia, California 92024 / US | 03 /
Heegard, Chris 4 Woodland Road, RD# 2 Ithaca, New York 14850 / US | 04 /
Krause, Edward A. 2720-32 Ariane Drive San Diego, California 92117 / US | 05 /
Heller, Jerrold A. 4932 Rancho Viejo Drive Del Mar, California 92014 / US | [1993/04] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/04] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c D-70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 92112592.8 | 23.07.1992 | [1993/04] | Priority number, date | US19910736738 | 26.07.1991 Original published format: US 736738 | US19920908407 | 10.07.1992 Original published format: US 908407 | [1993/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0524625 | Date: | 27.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0524625 | Date: | 19.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0524625 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/24, H04L27/34, H04N7/00 | [1998/50] | CPC: |
H04L1/0057 (EP,US);
H04N7/12 (KR);
H04L1/006 (EP,US);
H04L1/0065 (EP,US);
H04L1/0071 (EP,US);
H04L27/3438 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1994/02] | H04N7/13, H04L27/34, H04N7/00 | ||
Former IPC [1993/04] | H04N7/13 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Übertragung von komprimierten Videosignalen mit Trellis-Q.A.M.-Kodierung | [1993/04] | English: | Method and apparatus for communicating compressed video using trellis coded QAM | [1993/04] | French: | Méthode et dispositif de communication de vidéo comprimée avec un codage Q.A.M. en trellis | [1993/04] | Examination procedure | 22.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/24] | 18.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 31.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.02.1999 | CH | 03.02.1999 | ES | 03.02.1999 | GR | 03.02.1999 | IT | 03.02.1999 | LI | 03.02.1999 | DK | 03.05.1999 | PT | 03.05.1999 | [2008/02] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 03.02.1999 | |
CH | 03.02.1999 | ||
ES | 03.02.1999 | ||
GR | 03.02.1999 | ||
LI | 03.02.1999 | ||
DK | 03.05.1999 | ||
PT | 03.05.1999 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 03.02.1999 | |
CH | 03.02.1999 | ||
ES | 03.02.1999 | ||
GR | 03.02.1999 | ||
LI | 03.02.1999 | ||
PT | 03.05.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 03.02.1999 | |
CH | 03.02.1999 | ||
GR | 03.02.1999 | ||
LI | 03.02.1999 | ||
PT | 03.05.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 03.02.1999 | |
CH | 03.02.1999 | ||
LI | 03.02.1999 | ||
PT | 03.05.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 03.02.1999 | |
PT | 03.05.1999 | ||
CH | 10.05.1999 | ||
LI | 10.05.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | AT | 03.02.1999 | |
PT | 03.05.1999 | ||
Former [2000/21] | AT | 03.02.1999 | Cited in | by applicant | US5057916 | US5068724 | US19910736738 | US19920852330 |