EP0534088 - Nasal dispenser of atomized pharmaceutical substances [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2003 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): MC | published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELETTRO PLASTICA S.p.A. Via Lambro, 86 I-20089 Rozzano, Milan / IT | [1995/48] |
Former [1993/13] | For all designated states ELETTRO PLASTICA S.p.A. Via Lambro, 86 I-20089 Quinto de Stampi-Rozzano (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marelli, Andrea Via Lambro, 86 I-20089 Rozzano, Milan / IT | [1993/13] | Representative(s) | Giambrocono, Alfonso, et al Giambrocono & C. S.p.A. Via Rosolino Pilo 19/B 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/13] | Giambrocono, Alfonso, Dr. Ing., et al Ing. A. Giambrocono & C. S.r.l. Via Rosolino Pilo 19/B I-20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 92112826.0 | 28.07.1992 | [1993/13] | Priority number, date | IT1991MI02546 | 24.09.1991 Original published format: IT MI912546 | [1993/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0534088 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0534088 | Date: | 29.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B05B11/00, B05B1/34, B65D83/14, A61M15/08 | [1993/13] | CPC: |
B65D83/306 (EP);
B05B1/3436 (EP);
B05B11/0005 (EP);
A61M15/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/13] | Title | German: | Nasenspray | [1993/13] | English: | Nasal dispenser of atomized pharmaceutical substances | [1993/13] | French: | Pulvérisateur nasal | [1993/13] | Examination procedure | 18.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/20] | 14.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.11.1995 | BE | 29.11.1995 | DK | 29.11.1995 | GR | 29.11.1995 | MC | 29.11.1995 | NL | 29.11.1995 | PT | 29.02.1996 | SE | 29.02.1996 | LU | 31.07.1996 | [2003/18] |
Former [2003/17] | AT | 29.11.1995 | |
BE | 29.11.1995 | ||
DK | 29.11.1995 | ||
GR | 29.11.1995 | ||
NL | 29.11.1995 | ||
PT | 29.02.1996 | ||
SE | 29.02.1996 | ||
MC | 28.07.1996 | ||
LU | 31.07.1996 | ||
Former [2003/07] | AT | 29.11.1995 | |
BE | 29.11.1995 | ||
DK | 29.11.1995 | ||
GR | 29.11.1995 | ||
MC | 29.11.1995 | ||
NL | 29.11.1995 | ||
PT | 29.02.1996 | ||
SE | 29.02.1996 | ||
LU | 31.07.1996 | ||
Former [2001/24] | AT | 29.11.1995 | |
BE | 29.11.1995 | ||
DK | 29.11.1995 | ||
GR | 29.11.1995 | ||
MC | 29.11.1995 | ||
PT | 29.02.1996 | ||
SE | 29.02.1996 | ||
LU | 31.07.1996 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 29.11.1995 | |
BE | 29.11.1995 | ||
DK | 29.11.1995 | ||
GR | 29.11.1995 | ||
PT | 29.02.1996 | ||
SE | 29.02.1996 | ||
LU | 31.07.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 29.11.1995 | |
BE | 29.11.1995 | ||
DK | 29.11.1995 | ||
PT | 29.02.1996 | ||
SE | 29.02.1996 | ||
Former [1998/14] | AT | 29.11.1995 | |
BE | 29.11.1995 | ||
PT | 29.02.1996 | ||
SE | 29.02.1996 | ||
Former [1996/31] | AT | 29.11.1995 | |
BE | 29.11.1995 | ||
SE | 29.02.1996 | ||
Former [1996/30] | AT | 29.11.1995 | |
SE | 29.02.1996 | ||
Former [1996/28] | AT | 29.11.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4220285 (GUALDI PIERO [IT]); | [AD]EP0131501 (VALOIS SA [FR]) |