EP0544994 - Ring [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.02.1996 [1996/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ANGELIKA DUBS CREATIV FORUM Bungertweg 1 CH-8303 Bassersdorf / CH | [1993/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dubs, Jakob Ulrich Bungertweg 1 CH-8303 Bassersdorf / CH | [1993/23] | Representative(s) | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Horneggstrasse 4 8008 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/23] | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Horneggstrasse 4 CH-8008 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 92112906.0 | 29.07.1992 | [1993/23] | Priority number, date | CH19910003328 | 15.11.1991 Original published format: CH 332891 | [1993/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0544994 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0544994 | Date: | 08.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A63F9/08, A44C9/00 | [1993/23] | CPC: |
A63F9/0876 (EP);
A44C9/00 (EP);
A63F2009/0021 (EP);
A63F2009/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/23] | Title | German: | Ring | [1993/23] | English: | Ring | [1993/23] | French: | Bague | [1993/23] | Examination procedure | 09.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/40] | 04.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1338973 (ROBERT BROWN); | [A]US3596380 (WILLIAMS JAMES J); | [A]US4826171 (MORSE HENRY S [US]) | Examination | - Erich Steingräber, Alter Schmuck, Verlag Georg D.W. Callwey 1970, Abbildung 228 |