EP0525748 - Method and apparatus for removing hydrocarbons from polymer slurries [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUANTUM CHEMICAL CORPORATION 11500 Northlake Drive Cincinnati, OH 45249 / US | [1993/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sung, Chieh-Yuan 7005 Plumwood Court Cincinnati, Ohio / US | 02 /
Krause, Stephen J. 28 Banberry Trace Batavia, Ohio / US | [1993/05] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92112949.0 | 29.07.1992 | [1993/05] | Priority number, date | US19910739876 | 02.08.1991 Original published format: US 739876 | [1993/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0525748 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0525748 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B01D3/06, C08F6/10 | [1993/05] | CPC: |
B01D1/0094 (EP,US);
C08F6/00 (KR);
B01D3/06 (EP,US);
B01J8/004 (EP,US);
B01J8/20 (EP,US);
C08F6/003 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00761 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Entfernung von Kohlenwasserstoffen aus Polymersuspensionen | [1996/01] | English: | Method and apparatus for removing hydrocarbons from polymer slurries | [1993/05] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour enlever des hydrocarbures dans les suspensions de polymères | [1993/05] |
Former [1993/05] | Methode und Anlage zur Entfernung von Kohlenwasserstoffen aus Polymerschäumen | Examination procedure | 27.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/30] | 15.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 03.01.1996 | ES | 03.01.1996 | FR | 03.01.1996 | IT | 03.01.1996 | DE | 04.04.1996 | GB | 29.07.1996 | [2008/02] |
Former [2006/14] | BE | 03.01.1996 | |
ES | 03.01.1996 | ||
FR | 03.01.1996 | ||
IT | 03.01.1996 | ||
DE | 04.04.1996 | ||
GB | 29.07.1996 | ||
Former [2002/25] | BE | 03.01.1996 | |
ES | 03.01.1996 | ||
IT | 03.01.1996 | ||
DE | 04.04.1996 | ||
FR | 31.05.1996 | ||
GB | 29.07.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 03.01.1996 | |
IT | 03.01.1996 | ||
DE | 04.04.1996 | ||
FR | 31.05.1996 | ||
GB | 29.07.1996 | ||
Former [1997/30] | BE | 03.01.1996 | |
DE | 04.04.1996 | ||
FR | 31.05.1996 | ||
GB | 29.07.1996 | ||
Former [1996/51] | BE | 03.01.1996 | |
DE | 04.04.1996 | ||
FR | 31.05.1996 | ||
Former [1996/44] | DE | 04.04.1996 | |
FR | 31.05.1996 | ||
Former [1996/42] | FR | 31.05.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB897271 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO); | [A]FR2347387 (FIRESTONE TIRE & RUBBER CO [US]); | [A]US4184924 (HORNBAKER EDWIN D [US], et al); | [A]EP0415427 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO [US]) |