EP0525757 - Silencer with water cooling jacket [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.02.1994 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.1994 [1994/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sase, Toshitsugu 2253-37, Kamariya-cho, Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Matsuda, Michiaki 6-9-5-307, Tsurukawa Machida-shi, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Yanagisawa, Kiyoshi 139-12-643, Kamisakunobe, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1993/05] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92112983.9 | 30.07.1992 | [1993/05] | Priority number, date | JP19910216584 | 02.08.1991 Original published format: JP 21658491 | [1993/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0525757 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/04, F01N1/08 | [1993/05] | CPC: |
F01N3/043 (EP);
F01N1/08 (KR);
F01N1/089 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1993/05] | Title | German: | Schalldämpfer mit wassergekühlter Ummantelung | [1993/05] | English: | Silencer with water cooling jacket | [1993/05] | French: | Silencieux à enveloppe d'eau de refroidissement | [1993/05] | File destroyed: | 23.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 04.08.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/14] | 09.11.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE417751 (LINKE HOFMANN LAUCHHAMMER AG); | [X]DE3039742 (MOTOREN WERKE MANNHEIM AG [DE]); | [X]DE2909530 (BOGDANSKI FRANZ DR ING); | [X]US1936698 (VINCENT JESSE G) |