EP0581983 - Apparatus for performing capillary electrophoresis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.10.1997 [1997/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard GmbH Postfach 14 30 D-71004 Böblingen / DE | [1994/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zimmermann, Hans-Peter Im Buckeberg 2 W-7516 Karlsbad / DE | [1994/06] | Representative(s) | Harbach, Thomas, et al Agilent Technologies Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung Herrenbergerstrasse 130 71034 Böblingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | Harbach, Thomas, et al Hewlett-Packard GmbH, Europ. Patent- und Lizenzabteilung, Postfach 14 30 D-71004 Böblingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 92113244.5 | 04.08.1992 | [1994/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0581983 | Date: | 09.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0581983 | Date: | 23.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/447 | [1994/06] | CPC: |
G01N27/44704 (EP,US);
G01N27/44743 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1994/06] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung für die Kapillarelektrophorese | [1996/20] | English: | Apparatus for performing capillary electrophoresis | [1994/06] | French: | Appareil pour l'exécution d'électrophorèse capillaire | [1994/06] |
Former [1994/06] | Vorrichtung zur Durchfürung der Kapillarelektroforese | Examination procedure | 16.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/19] | 11.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0383459 (BECKMAN INSTRUMENTS INC [US]); | [Y]EP0475533 (PRINCE TECHNOLOGIES B V [NL]); | [A]EP0448313 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]); | [A]US4242909 (GUNDELFINGER RICHARD); | [A]GB2057288 (PERKIN ELMER CORP); | [A]US4713974 (STONE STANLEY A [US]) | [A] - ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY vol. 60, no. 7, April 1988, COLUMBUS US pages 642 - 648 D.J. ROSE ET AL 'Characterization and automation of sample introduction methods for capillary zone electrophoresis' |