Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0582724
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
12.03.1999 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 28.04.1999 [1999/17] |
20.11.1998 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
28.08.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.08.1998 |
Application refused |
|
21.08.1998 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
08.06.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
29.04.1998 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
23.04.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
23.04.1998 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
22.04.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
22.04.1998 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
15.04.1998 |
Application refused |
|
03.11.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
29.08.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.08.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.08.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
22.03.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
29.06.1995 |
First examination report |
|
11.08.1994 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.09.1994 [1994/39] |
18.02.1994 |
Change - designated states |
published on 13.04.1994 [1994/15] |
30.12.1993 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.02.1994 [1994/07] |