EP0528271 - Human parathyroid hormone muteins and production thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Doshomachi, 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/08] | For all designated states TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukuda, Tsunehiko 10-202, 9 Oharanonishisakaedani-cho Nishikyo-ku, Kyoto 610-11 / JP | [1993/08] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1993/08] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 92113322.9 | 05.08.1992 | [1993/08] | Priority number, date | JP19910198056 | 07.08.1991 Original published format: JP 19805691 | JP19920169713 | 26.06.1992 Original published format: JP 16971392 | [1993/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0528271 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0528271 | Date: | 23.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/635, C12N15/16, C12N15/18, C12N1/21, C12N5/10, C12P21/02 | [1997/17] | CPC: |
C07K14/635 (EP);
C07K2319/41 (EP);
C07K2319/735 (EP);
C07K2319/75 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1993/08] | C07K7/10, C12N15/16, C12N15/18, C12N1/21, C12N5/10, C12P21/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1993/08] | Title | German: | Muteine des menschlichen Parathormons und ihre Herstellung | [1993/08] | English: | Human parathyroid hormone muteins and production thereof | [1993/08] | French: | Mutéines de l'hormone parathyroidienne humaine et leur production | [1993/08] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 28.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/38] | 27.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.04.1997 | BE | 23.04.1997 | DK | 23.04.1997 | ES | 23.04.1997 | GR | 23.04.1997 | IT | 23.04.1997 | NL | 23.04.1997 | PT | 23.07.1997 | SE | 23.07.1997 | IE | 05.08.1997 | LU | 05.08.1997 | [2008/02] |
Former [2004/38] | AT | 23.04.1997 | |
BE | 23.04.1997 | ||
DK | 23.04.1997 | ||
ES | 23.04.1997 | ||
GR | 23.04.1997 | ||
IT | 23.04.1997 | ||
NL | 23.04.1997 | ||
PT | 23.07.1997 | ||
SE | 23.07.1997 | ||
IE | 05.08.1997 | ||
LU | 05.08.1997 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 23.04.1997 | |
BE | 23.04.1997 | ||
DK | 23.04.1997 | ||
ES | 23.04.1997 | ||
GR | 23.04.1997 | ||
IT | 23.04.1997 | ||
NL | 23.04.1997 | ||
PT | 23.07.1997 | ||
SE | 23.07.1997 | ||
IE | 05.08.1997 | ||
LU | 31.08.1997 | ||
Former [2001/01] | AT | 23.04.1997 | |
BE | 23.04.1997 | ||
DK | 23.04.1997 | ||
GR | 23.04.1997 | ||
IT | 23.04.1997 | ||
NL | 23.04.1997 | ||
PT | 23.07.1997 | ||
SE | 23.07.1997 | ||
IE | 05.08.1997 | ||
LU | 31.08.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 23.04.1997 | |
BE | 23.04.1997 | ||
DK | 23.04.1997 | ||
GR | 23.04.1997 | ||
IT | 23.04.1997 | ||
NL | 23.04.1997 | ||
PT | 23.07.1997 | ||
SE | 23.07.1997 | ||
LU | 31.08.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 23.04.1997 | |
BE | 23.04.1997 | ||
DK | 23.04.1997 | ||
IT | 23.04.1997 | ||
NL | 23.04.1997 | ||
PT | 23.07.1997 | ||
SE | 23.07.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 23.04.1997 | |
BE | 23.04.1997 | ||
DK | 23.04.1997 | ||
NL | 23.04.1997 | ||
PT | 23.07.1997 | ||
SE | 23.07.1997 | ||
Former [1998/12] | AT | 23.04.1997 | |
BE | 23.04.1997 | ||
NL | 23.04.1997 | ||
PT | 23.07.1997 | ||
SE | 23.07.1997 | ||
Former [1998/10] | AT | 23.04.1997 | |
BE | 23.04.1997 | ||
NL | 23.04.1997 | ||
PT | 23.07.1997 | ||
Former [1998/03] | AT | 23.04.1997 | |
NL | 23.04.1997 | ||
PT | 23.07.1997 | ||
Former [1998/02] | AT | 23.04.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0139076 (BIOTECHNOLOG FORSCHUNG GMBH [DE]); | [A]WO8803165 (SELMER SANDE AS [NO], et al); | [A]EP0341963 (MERCK & CO INC [US]); | [X]WO9014415 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US]); | [AP]EP0451867 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND [JP]) |