EP0530522 - Process for preparing amides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.1995 | Change - withdrawal | published on 19.07.1995 [1995/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/15] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1993/10] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI KASEI CORPORATION 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morimoto, Yuuki 2-11-1, Naruse Machida-shi, Tokyo-to / JP | 02 /
Miyasaka, Kiyoyuki 19-404, 1-13-6, Ogawa Machida-shi, Tokyo-to / JP | 03 /
Sashida, Reiko 4-44-7, Higashiyurigaoka, Asao-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Teranishi, Yutaka 1-14-2, Takane Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 05 /
Ochiai, Masanori 2-15-15, Katsuradai, Midori-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 06 /
Yamada, Kazunori 28-6, Umegaoka, Midori-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 07 /
Mori, Akiko 2-26-9, Katsuradai, Midori-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1993/10] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/10] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92113339.3 | 05.08.1992 | [1993/10] | Priority number, date | JP19910195496 | 05.08.1991 Original published format: JP 19549691 | JP19910195497 | 05.08.1991 Original published format: JP 19549791 | JP19910195498 | 05.08.1991 Original published format: JP 19549891 | JP19910233244 | 12.09.1991 Original published format: JP 23324491 | JP19910264980 | 14.10.1991 Original published format: JP 26498091 | JP19910264981 | 14.10.1991 Original published format: JP 26498191 | JP19910333533 | 17.12.1991 Original published format: JP 33353391 | JP19910333534 | 17.12.1991 Original published format: JP 33353491 | JP19920043457 | 28.02.1992 Original published format: JP 4345792 | JP19920043458 | 28.02.1992 Original published format: JP 4345892 | [1993/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0530522 | Date: | 10.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0530522 | Date: | 22.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C12P13/02, C12N1/20, // (C12N1/20, C12R1:01, 1:22) | [1993/38] | CPC: |
C12N1/205 (EP);
C12P13/02 (EP);
C12R2001/01 (EP);
C12R2001/22 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1993/10] | C12P13/02, C12N1/20, // (C12N1/20, C12R1:22, 1:01) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Amiden | [1993/10] | English: | Process for preparing amides | [1993/10] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'amides | [1993/10] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 24.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/34] | 17.01.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0178106 ; | [A]EP0188316 (NITTO CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0187681 (NITTO CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]EP0093782 (NITTO CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO LTD [JP]); | [XP]EP0486289 (NITTO CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO LTD [JP]) | [XP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 115, no. 17, 28 October 1991, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 179099g, NAWAZ, MOHAMED S. ET AL. 'Metabolism of acrylonitrile by Klebsiella pneumonia.' page 512 ; | [XP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 116, no. 9, 2 March 1992, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 80137b, NAWAZ, MOHAMED S. ET AL. 'Metabolism of benzonitrile and butyronitrile by Klebsiella pneumoniae.' page 463 ; | [XP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 117, no. 11, 14 September 1992, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 106944, STEVENSON,DAVID E. ET AL 'Mechanistic and structural studies on Rhodococcus ATCC 39484 nitrilase.' page 392 ; |