EP0540829 - Novel liquid crystal alignment treating agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1997 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. 7-1, 3-chome Kanda-Nishiki-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/19] | For all designated states NISSAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. 7-1, 3-chome Kanda-Nishiki-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Isogai, Hideyuki, c/o Nissan Chemical Ind. Ltd. Chuo Kenkyusho, 722-1, Tsuboi-cho Funabashi-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Abe, Toyohiko, c/o Nissan Chemical Ind. Ltd. Chuo Kenkyusho, 722-1, Tsuboi-cho Funabashi-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 03 /
* * * | 04 /
Fukuro, Hiroyoshi, c/o Nissan Chemical Ind. Ltd. Chuo Kenkyusho, 722-1, Tsuboi-cho Funabashi-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | [1993/19] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/19] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92113417.7 | 06.08.1992 | [1993/19] | Priority number, date | JP19910202916 | 13.08.1991 Original published format: JP 20291691 | [1993/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0540829 | Date: | 12.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0540829 | Date: | 26.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1337, C08G73/10 | [1993/19] | CPC: |
C08G73/1067 (EP,US);
C09K19/56 (KR);
C08G73/1071 (EP,US);
G02F1/133723 (EP,US);
C09K2323/023 (EP,US);
C09K2323/027 (EP,US);
C09K2323/0271 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/19] | Title | German: | Neues Flüssigkristallorientierungsmittel | [1993/19] | English: | Novel liquid crystal alignment treating agent | [1993/19] | French: | Nouvel agent d'alignement de cristal liquide | [1993/19] | Examination procedure | 02.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/44] | 24.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.02.1997 | BE | 26.02.1997 | DK | 26.02.1997 | ES | 26.02.1997 | GR | 26.02.1997 | PT | 26.05.1997 | SE | 26.05.1997 | IE | 06.08.1997 | LU | 06.08.1997 | [2004/38] |
Former [2002/25] | AT | 26.02.1997 | |
BE | 26.02.1997 | ||
DK | 26.02.1997 | ||
ES | 26.02.1997 | ||
GR | 26.02.1997 | ||
PT | 26.05.1997 | ||
SE | 26.05.1997 | ||
IE | 06.08.1997 | ||
LU | 31.08.1997 | ||
Former [2001/01] | AT | 26.02.1997 | |
BE | 26.02.1997 | ||
DK | 26.02.1997 | ||
GR | 26.02.1997 | ||
PT | 26.05.1997 | ||
SE | 26.05.1997 | ||
IE | 06.08.1997 | ||
LU | 31.08.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 26.02.1997 | |
BE | 26.02.1997 | ||
DK | 26.02.1997 | ||
GR | 26.02.1997 | ||
PT | 26.05.1997 | ||
SE | 26.05.1997 | ||
LU | 31.08.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 26.02.1997 | |
BE | 26.02.1997 | ||
DK | 26.02.1997 | ||
PT | 26.05.1997 | ||
SE | 26.05.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | AT | 26.02.1997 | |
BE | 26.02.1997 | ||
PT | 26.05.1997 | ||
SE | 26.05.1997 | ||
Former [1998/03] | AT | 26.02.1997 | |
BE | 26.02.1997 | ||
PT | 26.05.1997 | ||
Former [1997/49] | AT | 26.02.1997 | |
BE | 26.02.1997 | ||
Former [1997/42] | AT | 26.02.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0059790 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [X]EP0365855 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]); | [X]EP0415447 (CANON KK [JP]) | Examination | EP0456512 |