EP0528314 - Process for the preparation of bearable medicine containing an human protein for injection or infusion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.07.1995 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.08.1995 [1995/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/08] | For all designated states BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH D-68298 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Woog, Heinrich, Dr. Lindenstrasse 6 W-6947 Laudenbach / DE | 02 /
Demmer, Fritz, Dr. Kastanienweg 21 W-6945 Hirschberg-Leutershausen / DE | 03 /
Winter, Gerhard, Dr. Jahnstrasse 20E W-6915 Dossenheim / DE | 04 /
Markl, Hans-Jörg Auf der Kreh 6 W-6701 Ellerstadt / DE | 05 /
Gruber, Werner Riedackerweg 2 W-6943 Birkenau / DE | [1993/08] | Application number, filing date | 92113572.9 | 10.08.1992 | [1993/08] | Priority number, date | DE19914126984 | 15.08.1991 Original published format: DE 4126984 | [1993/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0528314 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61K37/02, A61K47/12, A61K47/18, A61K47/02 | [1993/08] | CPC: |
A61K38/1816 (EP,US);
A61K38/193 (EP);
A61K47/02 (EP);
A61K47/12 (EP);
A61K47/183 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | PT [1993/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Humanprotein-enthaltenden, gut verträglichen Arzneimitteln für Infusions- oder Injektionszwecke | [1993/08] | English: | Process for the preparation of bearable medicine containing an human protein for injection or infusion | [1993/08] | French: | Procédé de préparation de médicaments tolérables à base de protéine humaine pour perfusion au injection | [1993/08] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 10.08.1992 | Examination requested [1993/08] | 01.03.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/35] | 31.03.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1995/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1994 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0178665 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]); | [A]GB2171303 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD); | [Y]GB2177914 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD); | [A]EP0253226 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]); | [XD]EP0306824 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]); | [AD]EP0430200 (BEHRINGWERKE AG [DE]); | [A]WO9111200 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE]) | [A] - ROTH H.J. ET AL 'HAGERS HANDBUCH DER PHARMAZEUTISCHEN PRAXIS' 1971 , SPRINGER VERLAG , BERLIN-HEIDELBERG-NEW YORK |