Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2582020Y | Global Dossier | 30.09.1998 | Y2 | JPH0557148U | 30.07.1993 | U | Priority number | Date | DE9110957 | 04.09.1991 | SG9590623 | 06.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0530545 | Global Dossier | 26.10.1994 | B1 | EP0530545 | 10.03.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE9110957 | 04.09.1991 | SG9590623 | 06.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE113330T | 15.11.1994 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE9110957 | 04.09.1991 | SG9590623 | 06.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59200694D1 | 01.12.1994 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE59200694 | 10.08.1992 | DE9110957 | 04.09.1991 | SG9590623 | 06.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE9110957U | 07.11.1991 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE9110957 | 04.09.1991 | SG9590623 | 06.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0530545T | 10.04.1995 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE9110957 | 04.09.1991 | SG9590623 | 06.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2062856T | 16.12.1994 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE9110957 | 04.09.1991 | SG9590623 | 06.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK62995 | 05.05.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | DE9110957 | 04.09.1991 | SG9590623 | 06.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL103018 | 29.06.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | DE9110957 | 04.09.1991 | SG9590623 | 06.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5294472 | 15.03.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | DE9110957 | 04.09.1991 | SG9590623 | 06.04.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG32573G | 01.09.1995 | G | Priority number | Date | DE9110957 | 04.09.1991 |