EP0530545 - Cellular panels made of aromatic polycarbonates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60311 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/10] | For all designated states Degussa Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 D-60311 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arnold, Norbert, Dr. Weinhalde 33 W-7244 Waldachtal / DE | 02 /
Wiebel, Wolfgang Ankergasse 37 W-8751 Haibach / DE | [1993/10] | Application number, filing date | 92113610.7 | 10.08.1992 | [1993/10] | Priority number, date | DE19910010957U | 04.09.1991 Original published format: DE 9110957 U | [1993/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0530545 | Date: | 10.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0530545 | Date: | 26.10.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | E04C2/54, E04C2/34 | [1993/10] | CPC: |
E04C2/34 (EP,US);
E04C2/543 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24174 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24182 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2457 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24612 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24661 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2495 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24967 (EP,US);
Y10T428/27 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1993/10] | Title | German: | Schrägstegmehrfachplatten aus aromatischen Polycarbonaten | [1993/10] | English: | Cellular panels made of aromatic polycarbonates | [1993/10] | French: | Panneaux cellulaires en polycarbonates aromatiques | [1993/10] | Examination procedure | 10.08.1992 | Examination requested [1993/10] | 28.01.1993 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 08.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.1993 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 11.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
03.03.1995
23.03.1995
ADMISSIBLE Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | 02
14.07.1995
17.08.1995
ADMISSIBLE Kaysersberg Packaging 23, Bd. Georges Clemenceau F- 92402 Courbevoie Cedex / FR Opponent's representative David, Daniel Gevers France 41, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | 03
26.07.1995
04.08.1995
ADMISSIBLE Röhm GmbH Kirschenallee 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.03.1995
23.03.1995
ADMISSIBLE Bayer AG Konzernzentrale RP Patente Konzern - D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
02
14.07.1995
17.08.1995
ADMISSIBLE Kaysersberg Packaging 23, Bd. Georges Clemenceau F- 92402 Courbevoie Cedex / FR Opponent's representative David, Daniel Bloch & Bonnétat 23bis, rue de Turin 75008 Paris / FR | |||
03
26.07.1995
04.08.1995
ADMISSIBLE Röhm GmbH Kirschenallee D-64293 Darmstadt / DE | |||
Former [1995/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.03.1995
23.03.1995
ADMISSIBLE Bayer AG Konzernzentrale RP Patente Konzern - D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
02
14.07.1995
17.08.1995
ADMISSIBLE Kaysersberg Packaging 23, Bd. Georges Clemenceau F- 92402 Courbevoie Cedex / FR Opponent's representative David, Daniel KAYSERSBERG, Service Propriété Industrielle, 23 boulevard Georges Clemenceau F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | |||
03
26.07.1995
04.08.1995
ADMISSIBLE Röhm GmbH Kirschenallee D-64293 Darmstadt / DE | |||
Former [1995/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.03.1995
23.03.1995
ADMISSIBLE Bayer AG Konzernzentrale RP Patente Konzern - D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
02
14.07.1995
17.08.1995
ADMISSIBLE Kaysersberg Packaging 23, Bd. Georges Clemenceau F- 92402 Courbevoie Cedex / FR Opponent's representative David, Daniel KAYSERSBERG, Service Propriété Industrielle, 23 boulevard Georges Clemenceau F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | |||
Former [1995/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.03.1995
23.03.1995
ADMISSIBLE Bayer AG Konzernzentrale RP Patente Konzern - D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | 05.09.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.12.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.09.1997 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1998/02] | 09.09.1997 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Appeal following opposition | 19.03.1996 | Appeal received No. T0270/96 | 11.05.1996 | Statement of grounds filed | 09.09.1997 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in unamended form | 09.09.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.09.1997 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0054856 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]EP0286003 (MONCH KUNSTSTOFFTECH GMBH [DE]) | Examination | - J. Wiedemann, "Leichtbau - Band 1: Elemente", 1986, Springer Verlag, Berlin,Seiten 416-418 |