EP0529393 - Dosing pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/09] | Method and device for dosing pumping | ||
[1996/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.1996 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.01.1997 [1997/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance SA Avenue Général-Guisan 70 1009 Pully / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1995/34] | For all designated states Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance SA Avenue Général-Guisan 70 CH-1009 Pully / CH | ||
Former [1994/19] | For all designated states TETRA BRIK RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT S.P.A. Via Delfini 1 I-411 00 Modena / IT | ||
Former [1993/09] | For all designated states TETRA DEV-CO Via Delfini 1 I-411 00 Modena / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fontanazzi, Paolo via Fregni 47 I-411 00 Modena / IT | 02 /
Fini, Alberto via De Amicis 53/a I-410 12 Carpi (MO) / IT | [1993/09] | Representative(s) | Bentz, Bengt Christer, et al AB Tetra Pak Patent Department Ruben Rausings gata 221 86 Lund / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/34] | Bentz, Bengt Christer, et al AB Tetra Pak Patent Department Ruben Rausings gata S-221 86 Lund / SE | ||
Former [1993/09] | Bentz, Bengt Christer AB Tetra Pak Patent Department Ruben Rausings gata S-221 86 Lund / SE | Application number, filing date | 92113623.0 | 10.08.1992 | [1993/09] | Priority number, date | IT1991MI02291 | 27.08.1991 Original published format: IT MI912291 | [1993/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0529393 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0529393 | Date: | 17.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B65B3/32, F04B11/00 | [1993/09] | CPC: |
F04B11/005 (EP,US);
B65B3/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1993/09] | Title | German: | Dosierpumpe | [1996/03] | English: | Dosing pump | [1996/03] | French: | Pompe de dosage | [1996/03] |
Former [1993/09] | Dosierpumpverfahren und -vorrichtung | ||
Former [1993/09] | Method and device for dosing pumping | ||
Former [1993/09] | Méthode et dispositif de pompage à dosage | Examination procedure | 07.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/35] | 15.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CH516084 (ISMATEC S A [CH]); | [X]FR2342203 (ERCA [FR]); | [X]CH617752 (KUSTNER SA) | Examination | EP0492928 |