EP0527484 - Lightweight structural element and method of making it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.1994 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EURO-COMPOSITES S.A. B.P. 95, Zone Industrielle L-6401 Echternach / LU | [1993/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Menei, Leonardo 18, rue de l'Eglise L-6186 Gonderange / LU | [1993/28] |
Former [1993/07] | 01 /
Meinei, Leonardo 18, rue de l'Eglise L-6186 Gonderange / LU | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/07] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, Dr., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92113755.0 | 12.08.1992 | [1993/07] | Priority number, date | DE19914126781 | 13.08.1991 Original published format: DE 4126781 | [1993/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0527484 | Date: | 17.02.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B32B3/12, B32B3/30, E04C2/40, E04C2/32 | [1993/07] | CPC: |
B32B3/12 (EP,US);
B32B3/30 (US);
B32B5/26 (US);
B32B7/06 (US);
B32B7/12 (US);
E04C2/405 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/07] | Title | German: | Leichtbau-Flächenelement und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines solchen | [1993/07] | English: | Lightweight structural element and method of making it | [1993/07] | French: | Elément de structure léger et procédé de sa fabrication | [1993/07] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 23.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/38] | 03.06.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1096982 ; | [X]US4121008 ; | [AD]WO8910258 ; | [A]EP0164280 ; | [A]EP0424312 ; | [A]GB2204341 |