EP0529434 - Agitator ball mill and method of operation thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/09] | Method of operating an agitator ball mill and agitator ball mill for carrying out the method | ||
[1996/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.06.1997 [1997/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMYA GmbH Brohler Strasse 11 50968 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | For all designated states OMYA GmbH Brohler Strasse 11 D-50968 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barthelmess, Ulrich Grosse Gasse 25 W-7908 Niederstotzingen / DE | 02 /
Schindler, Ulrich, Dr. Gartenstrasse 61 W-7908 Niederstotzingen / DE | [1993/09] | Representative(s) | Kreutz, Karl-Jürgen Patentanwalt Osterwaldstrasse 149 80805 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Kreutz, Karl Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Osterwaldstrasse 149 D-80805 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92113855.8 | 14.08.1992 | [1993/09] | Priority number, date | DE19914128074 | 23.08.1991 Original published format: DE 4128074 | [1993/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0529434 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0529434 | Date: | 12.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B02C17/16, B02C17/00 | [1993/09] | CPC: |
B02C17/002 (EP,US);
B02C17/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/09] | Title | German: | Rührwerksmühle und Verfahren zu deren Betrieb | [1996/24] | English: | Agitator ball mill and method of operation thereof | [1996/24] | French: | Broyeur-agitateur et méthode d'emploi de celui. | [1996/24] |
Former [1993/09] | Verfahren zum Betrieb einer Rührwerkskugelmühle und Rührwerkskugelmühle zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | ||
Former [1993/09] | Method of operating an agitator ball mill and agitator ball mill for carrying out the method | ||
Former [1993/09] | Procédé de fonctionnement d'un broyeur-agitateur à billes et broyeur-agitateur à billes pour la mise en oeuvre dudit procédé | Examination procedure | 10.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/40] | 19.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.1995 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.11.1995 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 07.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1289073 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG); | [A]FR1315156 ; | [X]US3223336 (OTTO WIENERT FRITZ) |