EP0516192 - Reactive hindered amine light stabilizers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.07.1997 [1997/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA, INC. 2000 Market Street Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19102-3222 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/02] | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA, INC. 2000 Market Street Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19102-3222 / US | ||
Former [1992/49] | For all designated states ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA, INC. Three Parkway Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19102 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kazmierczak, Robert Thaddeus 208 Shetland Drive Williamsville, New York 14221 / US | 02 /
Macleay, Ronald Edward 10 Mahogany Drive Williamsville, New York 14221 / US | [1992/49] | Representative(s) | Abitz, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/49] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92113890.5 | 13.02.1989 | [1992/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0516192 | Date: | 02.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0516192 | Date: | 23.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/3435, C07D211/56, C07D211/60, C07D211/92 | [1992/52] | CPC: |
C07D401/04 (EP);
C07D211/58 (EP);
C08K5/3435 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/3435, C08L23/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/49] | C08K5/34, C07D211/56, C07D211/92, C07D211/60 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/49] | Title | German: | Reaktive, gehinderte Aminlichtstabilisatoren | [1992/49] | English: | Reactive hindered amine light stabilizers | [1992/49] | French: | Photostabilisants réactifs à amine inhibée | [1992/49] | Examination procedure | 11.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/28] | 07.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.12.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/28] | 13.01.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/28] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP89902901.1 / EP0410970 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1997 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0020293 | [AD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 106, no. 8, 23 February 1987, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 51173y, page 37 ; |