EP0535344 - Apparatus for detecting and signaling the function and the status of an elevator safety brake [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/14] | For all designated states INVENTIO AG Seestrasse 55 CH-6052 Hergiswil NW / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lam, Miles P. 22 Cramer Dr. Chester, NJ 07930 / US | 02 /
Bachmann, Herbert Dreilindenstrasse 63 CH-6006 Luzern / CH | [1993/14] | Application number, filing date | 92113950.7 | 17.08.1992 | [1993/14] | Priority number, date | US19910771044 | 02.10.1991 Original published format: US 771044 | [1993/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0535344 | Date: | 07.04.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0535344 | Date: | 29.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B66B5/00, B66B5/18, F16D59/02 | [1993/14] | CPC: |
B66B5/0031 (EP,US);
B66B5/0006 (EP,US);
B66B5/0037 (EP,US);
B66B5/18 (EP,US);
F16D55/2245 (EP,US);
F16D59/02 (EP,US);
F16D66/023 (EP,US);
F16D66/028 (EP,US);
F16D2066/003 (EP,US);
F16D2121/22 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1993/14] | Title | German: | Einrichtung für die Erfassung und Signalisierung der Funktion und des Zustandes einer Sicherheitsbremse für Aufzüge | [1993/14] | English: | Apparatus for detecting and signaling the function and the status of an elevator safety brake | [1993/14] | French: | Dispositif de détection et de signalisation de la fonction et l'état d'un frein de sécurité pour ascenseurs | [1993/14] | Examination procedure | 17.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/45] | 07.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.08.1996 | GB | 17.08.1996 | ES | 18.08.1996 | [2004/28] |
Former [1998/02] | AT | 17.08.1996 | |
GB | 17.08.1996 | ||
Former [1997/30] | GB | 17.08.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2117278 (CANADIAN GE CO LTD); | [A]US4232768 (DUFRESNE JACQUES); | [A]GB2226292 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) |