EP0530577 - Device for positioning a loader used for automatically exchanging printing plates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.06.1997 [1997/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/10] | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 D-69115 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pfizenmaier, Wolfgang Hollmuthstrasse 3a W-6903 Neckargemünd / DE | 02 /
Blaser, Peter Theobald Neuwiesenweg 3 W-6912 Dielheim / DE | 03 /
Geider, Andreas Keltergasse 23 W-6837 St.Leon-Rot 2 / DE | 04 /
Hofheinz, Walter Wieblinger-Weg 26 W-6900 Heidelberg / DE | 05 /
Spiegel, Nikolaus, Dr. Lucas-Cranach-Strasse 24 W-6909 Walldorf / DE | 06 /
Jahn, Hans-Georg Dürer-Strasse 38 W-6901 Wiesenbach / DE | 07 /
Beisel, Hermann Zeppelinstrasse 5 W-6909 Walldorf / DE | 08 /
Jäger, Helmut Friedrich Haydnstrasse 4 W-7535 Königsbach-Stein 2 / DE | [1993/10] | Representative(s) | Stoltenberg, Heinz-Herbert Baldo c/o Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/10] | Stoltenberg, Baldo Heinz-Herbert c/o Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 D-69115 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 92114001.8 | 17.08.1992 | [1993/10] | Priority number, date | DE19914129021 | 31.08.1991 Original published format: DE 4129021 | DE19924224832 | 28.07.1992 Original published format: DE 4224832 | [1993/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0530577 | Date: | 10.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0530577 | Date: | 19.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B41F27/12 | [1993/10] | CPC: |
B41F27/1206 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/10] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Positionierung eines dem automatischen Druckplattenwechsel dienenden Magazins | [1993/10] | English: | Device for positioning a loader used for automatically exchanging printing plates | [1993/10] | French: | Dispositif pour positionner un chargeur servant au remplacement automatique des plaques d'impression | [1993/10] | Examination procedure | 17.08.1992 | Examination requested [1993/10] | 06.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP61248834 ; | [A]JP59022755 ; | [A]EP0431715 (KOMORI PRINTING MACH [JP]); | [A]EP0433798 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE]) | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 98 (M-575)(2545) 27. März 1987 & JP-A-61 248 834 ( MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD ), & JP61248834 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 116 (M-299)(1553) 30. Mai 1984 & JP-A-59 022 755 ( KOMORI INSATSU KIKAI K.K. ), & JP59022755 A 00000000 |