EP0530586 - Processing of color photographic recording materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.07.1998 [1998/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/10] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmittou, Eric Richard, c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Sowinski, Allan Francis, c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [1993/10] | Representative(s) | Brandes, Jürgen Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/10] | Brandes, Jürgen, Dr. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92114061.2 | 18.08.1992 | [1993/10] | Priority number, date | US19910747895 | 19.08.1991 Original published format: US 747895 | [1993/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0530586 | Date: | 10.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0530586 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0530586 | Date: | 16.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/30, G03C7/42 | [1993/10] | CPC: |
G03C7/3022 (EP,US);
G03C7/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/09] |
Former [1993/10] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Entwicklung von farbphotographischem Aufzeichnungsmaterial | [1993/15] | English: | Processing of color photographic recording materials | [1993/10] | French: | Traitement de matériaux photographiques couleurs d'enregistrement | [1993/10] |
Former [1993/10] | Entwicklung von farbphotographische Aufzeichnungsmaterial | Examination procedure | 06.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/44] | 18.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9106037 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]); | [Y]EP0428101 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) |