EP0529479 - Electric razor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.1996 [1996/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Braun Aktiengesellschaft Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states Braun Aktiengesellschaft Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1993/09] | For all designated states Braun Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 11 20 D-61466 Kronberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oprach, Klaus Friedrich-Stoltze-Strasse 31 W-6231 Schwalbach/Ts. / DE | 02 /
Hickel, Sigrun Haidgesweg 41 a W-6384 Schmitten / DE | 03 /
Eichhorn, Reinhold Feldbergstrasse 17 W-6270 Idstein-Kröftel / DE | 04 /
Schäfer, Gerhard An der Pfarrwiese 43 W-6000 Frankfurt am Main 50 / DE | 05 /
Dürr, Helmut Grosse Seestrasse 40 W-6000 Frankfurt am Main 90 / DE | [1993/09] | Application number, filing date | 92114064.6 | 18.08.1992 | [1993/09] | Priority number, date | DE19914128217 | 26.08.1991 Original published format: DE 4128217 | [1993/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0529479 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0529479 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B26B19/10, B26B19/38 | [1993/09] | CPC: |
B26B19/3886 (EP,US);
B26B19/102 (EP,US);
B26B19/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1993/09] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Rasierapparat | [1993/09] | English: | Electric razor | [1993/09] | French: | Rasoir électrique | [1993/09] | Examination procedure | 31.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/21] | 09.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2843947 (BRAUN AG [DE]); | [A]GB2129731 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [AD]DE3726354 (BRAUN AG [DE]); | [A]DE4039681 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) |