EP0528411 - High temperature ceramic composite [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.06.1996 [1996/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/08] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smith, Robert G., c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufact. Co., 2501 Hudson Road, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [1993/08] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/08] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92114133.9 | 19.08.1992 | [1993/08] | Priority number, date | US19910747647 | 20.08.1991 Original published format: US 747647 | [1993/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0528411 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0528411 | Date: | 14.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C04B41/89, C04B35/80 | [1993/08] | CPC: |
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B35/571 (EP,US);
C04B35/62863 (EP);
C04B35/62873 (EP);
C04B35/62889 (EP);
C04B35/62894 (EP);
C04B35/80 (EP,US);
C04B41/52 (EP,US);
C04B41/89 (EP,US);
F28F21/04 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3865 (EP);
C04B2235/5224 (EP);
C04B2235/5228 (EP);
C04B2235/5252 (EP);
C04B2235/5264 (EP);
C04B2235/5436 (EP);
C04B2235/5445 (EP);
C04B2235/6028 (EP);
C04B2235/606 (EP);
C04B2235/614 (EP);
C04B2235/616 (EP);
C04B2235/6567 (EP);
C04B2235/96 (EP);
F23D2212/00 (EP,US);
Y10S428/902 (EP,US);
Y10T428/131 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1314 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1317 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1362 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1369 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B14/4656, C04B30/02 (EP,US);
C04B41/009, C04B35/18 (US,EP);
C04B41/009, C04B35/806 (EP);
C04B41/52, C04B41/4529, C04B41/5059 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1993/08] | Title | German: | Hochtemperaturfester, keramischer Verbundstoff | [1995/24] | English: | High temperature ceramic composite | [1993/08] | French: | Composite céramique résistant à de hautes températures | [1993/08] |
Former [1993/08] | Hochtemperatur-keramischer Verbundstoff | Examination procedure | 31.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/21] | 19.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4735850 (EITMAN DAVID A [US]); | [YD]US4889686 (SINGH RAJ N [US], et al); | [YP]EP0495570 (HITCO [US]) |