EP0529524 - Wardrobe insert [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vauth-Sagel GmbH & Co. Neue Strasse 27 33034 Brakel / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | For all designated states VAUTH-SAGEL GmbH & Co. Neue Strasse 27 D-33034 Brakel / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sagel, Heinrich Grüne Bache 200 D-33034 Brakel / DE | [1997/22] |
Former [1993/09] | 01 /
Sagel, Heinrich Grüne Bache 200 W-3492 Brakel-Erkeln / DE | Representative(s) | Hanewinkel, Lorenz Patentanwalt Ferrariweg 17a 33102 Paderborn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Hanewinkel, Lorenz, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt Ferrariweg 17a D-33102 Paderborn / DE | Application number, filing date | 92114278.2 | 21.08.1992 | [1993/09] | Priority number, date | DE19910010689U | 29.08.1991 Original published format: DE 9110689 U | [1993/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0529524 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0529524 | Date: | 28.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A47B61/00 | [1993/09] | CPC: |
A47B55/02 (EP);
A47B61/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, SE [1993/09] | Title | German: | Kleiderschrank-Einsatz | [1993/09] | English: | Wardrobe insert | [1993/09] | French: | Compartiment intérieur pour armoires | [1993/09] | Examination procedure | 24.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/39] | 08.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 28.05.1997 | FR | 28.05.1997 | GB | 28.05.1997 | SE | 28.08.1997 | BE | 31.08.1997 | CH | 31.08.1997 | LI | 31.08.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/25] | ES | 28.05.1997 | |
GB | 28.05.1997 | ||
SE | 28.08.1997 | ||
BE | 31.08.1997 | ||
CH | 31.08.1997 | ||
LI | 31.08.1997 | ||
FR | 24.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/45] | GB | 28.05.1997 | |
SE | 28.08.1997 | ||
BE | 31.08.1997 | ||
CH | 31.08.1997 | ||
LI | 31.08.1997 | ||
FR | 24.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/41] | GB | 28.05.1997 | |
SE | 28.08.1997 | ||
BE | 31.08.1997 | ||
FR | 24.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/19] | BE | 28.05.1997 | |
GB | 28.05.1997 | ||
SE | 28.08.1997 | ||
FR | 24.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 28.05.1997 | |
GB | 28.05.1997 | ||
SE | 28.08.1997 | ||
Former [1998/12] | BE | 28.05.1997 | |
SE | 28.08.1997 | ||
Former [1998/10] | BE | 28.05.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2140418 (DILTS NOAH L); | [Y]GB512530 (THOMAS LOCKER & COMPANY LTD, et al); | [Y]DE2240097 (ALMASIO GIUSEPPE DEI FRATELLI); | [A]FR2183315 (C D SPECIALITES [FR]) |