EP0529583 - 3-(Vinylphenyloxy) propylsilane compound [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.11.1998 [1998/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kubota, Tohru, c/o Shin-Etsu Chem. Co. Ltd. 28-1, Oaza Nishi-Fukushima, Kubiki-mura Nakakubiki-gun, Niigata 942 / JP | 02 /
Ishihara, Toshinobu, c/o Shin-Etsu Chem. Co. Ltd. 28-1, Oaza Nishi-Fukushima, Kubiki-mura Nakakubiki-gun, Niigata 942 / JP | 03 /
Endo, Mikio, c/o Shin-Etsu Chem. Co. Ltd. 28-1, Oaza Nishi-Fukushima, Kubiki-mura Nakakubiki-gun, Niigata 942 / JP | 04 /
Uehara, Katsuhiro, c/o Shin-Etsu Chem. Co. Ltd. 28-1, Oaza Nishi-Fukushima, Kubiki-mura Nakakubiki-gun, Niigata 942 / JP | [1997/48] |
Former [1993/09] | 01 /
Kubota, Tohru, Synthetic Tech. Lab., SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO.,LTD., 28-1, Oaza Nishi-Fukushima Kubiki-mura, Nakakubiki-gun, Niigata 942 / JP | ||
02 /
Ishihara, Toshinobu, Synthetic Tech.Lab, SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO.,LTD., 28-1, Oaza Nishi-Fukushima Kubiki-mura, Nakakubiki-gun, Niigata 942 / JP | |||
03 /
Endo, Mikio, Synthetic Tech. Lab., SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO.,LTD., 28-1, Oaza Nishi-Fukushima Kubiki-mura, Nakakubiki-gun, Niigata 942 / JP | |||
04 /
Uehara, Katsuhiro, Synthetic Tech. Lab., SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO.,LTD., 28-1, Oaza Nishi-Fukushima Kubiki-mura, Nakakubiki-gun, Niigata 942 / JP | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92114468.9 | 25.08.1992 | [1993/09] | Priority number, date | JP19910213503 | 26.08.1991 Original published format: JP 21350391 | [1993/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0529583 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0529583 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07F7/18 | [1993/09] | CPC: |
C07F7/1804 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/09] | Title | German: | 3-(Vinylphenyloxy)propylsilan Verbindungen | [1993/09] | English: | 3-(Vinylphenyloxy) propylsilane compound | [1993/09] | French: | Composés de 3-(vinylphényloxy)propyl silane | [1993/09] | Examination procedure | 09.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/40] | 17.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2055871 (M & T CHEMICALS INC) |