EP0531888 - Method of forming fixed images [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAO CORPORATION 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayaba-cho, 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/11] | For all designated states KAO CORPORATION 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayaba-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yasuda, Shin-ichiro 994, Fuke, Misaki-cho Sennan-gun, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Kawabe, Kuniyasu 1-55-501, Komatsubara 6-chome Wakayama-shi, Wakayama-ken / JP | 03 /
Sasaki, Mitsuhiro 6-17-106, Komatsubara 6-chome Wakayama-shi, Wakayama-ken / JP | [1993/11] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/11] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER P.O. Box 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92115077.7 | 03.09.1992 | [1993/11] | Priority number, date | JP19910255764 | 07.09.1991 Original published format: JP 25576491 | JP19910255765 | 07.09.1991 Original published format: JP 25576591 | [1993/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0531888 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0531888 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/24, G03G15/16, G03G13/16 | [1994/22] | CPC: |
G03G13/16 (EP,US);
G03G13/20 (EP,US);
G03G15/24 (EP,US);
G03G9/09328 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/11] | G03G15/24, G03G15/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erzeugung fixierte Bilder | [1993/11] | English: | Method of forming fixed images | [1993/11] | French: | Méthode de formation d'images fixées | [1993/11] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 07.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/35] | 30.06.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH0336581 ; | [A]JPS59184385 ; | [A]JPH02238462 ; | [A]JPS6039673 ; | [A]JPS58184154 | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910430), vol. 015, no. 172, Database accession no. (P - 1197), & JP03036581 A 19910218 (CANON INC) [AD] 1,3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850223), vol. 009, no. 044, Database accession no. (P - 337), & JP59184385 A 19841019 (CANON KK) [A] 1,8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901212), vol. 014, no. 558, Database accession no. (P - 1141), & JP02238462 A 19900920 (CANON INC) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850709), vol. 009, no. 163, Database accession no. (P - 371), & JP60039673 A 19850301 (RICOH KK) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840209), vol. 008, no. 031, Database accession no. (P - 253), & JP58184154 A 19831027 (CANON KK) [A] 1,4 * abstract * |