EP0534218 - Silver halide photographic material having improved resistance to pressure desensitization [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.06.1996 [1996/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/13] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vacca, Alberto 3M italia Ricerche S.p.A. I-17016 Ferrania (Savona) / IT | 02 /
Salvo, Rosella 3M italia Ricerche S.p.A. I-17016 Ferrania (Savona) / IT | [1993/13] | Representative(s) | Allaix, Roberto Office of Intellectual Property Counsel 3M ITALIA S.p.A. Viale Martiri della Libertà, 57 17016 Ferrania (Savona) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/36] | Allaix, Roberto Office of Intellectual Property Counsel 3M ITALIA S.p.A. Viale Martiri della Libertà, 57 I-17016 Ferrania (Savona) / IT | ||
Former [1993/13] | Checcacci, Giorgio PORTA, CHECCACCI & BOTTI s.r.l. Viale Sabotino, 19/2 I-20135 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 92115267.4 | 07.09.1992 | [1993/13] | Priority number, date | IT1991MI02568 | 26.09.1991 Original published format: IT MI912568 | [1993/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0534218 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0534218 | Date: | 21.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/06 | [1993/13] | CPC: |
G03C1/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/13] | Title | German: | Photographisches Silberhalogenidmaterial mit verbessertem Widerstand gegen Druckdesensibilisierung | [1993/13] | English: | Silver halide photographic material having improved resistance to pressure desensitization | [1993/13] | French: | Matériau photographique à l'halogénure d'argent ayant une meilleure résistance à la désensibilisation et à la pression | [1993/13] | Examination procedure | 21.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/46] | 15.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP63116149 ; | [AD]EP0209010 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) | [A] - WORLD PATENTS INDEX LATEST Week 8826, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 88-179022 & JP-A-63 116 149 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO KK) 20 May 1988, & JP63116149 A 19880520 |