EP0533009 - Process for the preparation of composite articles and the composite articles obtained by this process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.1996 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.1996 [1996/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/12] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neuhaus, Alfred Habichtgasse 2 W-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | 02 /
Luckas, Bruno Petersbergstrasse 4 W-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | 03 /
Avar, Géza, Dr. H.-v.-Helmholtz-Strasse 26 W-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | [1993/12] | Application number, filing date | 92115268.2 | 07.09.1992 | [1993/12] | Priority number, date | DE19914131203 | 19.09.1991 Original published format: DE 4131203 | [1993/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0533009 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0533009 | Date: | 18.10.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/34, C08J9/02, // C08L75/04 | [1993/12] | CPC: |
C08J9/34 (EP,US);
C08J9/0066 (EP,US);
C08J9/02 (EP,US);
C08J2375/04 (EP,US);
Y10S264/77 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR [1993/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Verbundkörpern und die so erhaltenen Verbundkörper | [1993/12] | English: | Process for the preparation of composite articles and the composite articles obtained by this process | [1993/12] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'articles composites et les articles composites obtenus par ce procédé | [1993/12] | Examination procedure | 07.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/23] | 31.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3691265 (COBBLEDICK DAVID S); | [AD]DE2651400 (FRANZ BOVENDER ABIS KG, et al); | [APD]EP0451685 (BAYER AG [DE]) |