EP0537474 - Folding box with pouring spout [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Europa Carton Aktiengesellschaft Spitaler Strasse 11 D-20095 Hamburg / DE | [1993/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Skolik, Bernhard Am Sportplatz 20 W-2860 Osterholz-Scharmbeck / DE | [1993/16] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1993/16] | Dipl.-Ing. H. Hauck, Dipl.-Ing. E. Graalfs, Dipl.-Ing. W. Wehnert, Dr.-Ing. W. Döring Postfach 30 24 30 D-20308 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 92115449.8 | 10.09.1992 | [1993/16] | Priority number, date | DE19910012759U | 14.10.1991 Original published format: DE 9112759 U | [1993/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0537474 | Date: | 21.04.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0537474 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/74 | [1993/16] | CPC: |
B65D5/742 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1993/16] | Title | German: | Faltschachtel mit Schüttvorrichtung | [1993/16] | English: | Folding box with pouring spout | [1993/16] | French: | Boîte pliable munie d'un bec verseur | [1993/16] | Examination procedure | 12.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/41] | 23.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 04.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH618932 (MIGROS); | [X]US2349362 (MARSHALL DONALD E); | [Y]US4194677 (WYSOCKI LAWRENCE [US]) |