EP0534242 - Method to reduce voltage oscillations of a neutral point connection of a three-level inverter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.11.1996 [1996/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/13] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neubert, Rolf Lessingstrasse 10 8522 Herzogenaurach / DE | 02 /
Schuster, Roland Zeisigweg 12 8521 Möhrendorf / DE | [1995/39] |
Former [1993/13] | 01 /
Neubert, Rolf Lessingstrasse 10 W-8522 Herzogenaurach / DE | ||
02 /
Schuster, Roland Zeisigweg 12 W-8521 Möhrendorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 92115520.6 | 10.09.1992 | [1993/13] | Priority number, date | DE19914131763 | 24.09.1991 Original published format: DE 4131763 | [1993/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0534242 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0534242 | Date: | 29.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/48 | [1993/13] | CPC: |
H02M7/487 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, LI, SE [1993/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reduzierung von Spannungsschwingungen eines Zwischenkreismittenanschlusses eines Dreipunktumrichters | [1993/13] | English: | Method to reduce voltage oscillations of a neutral point connection of a three-level inverter | [1993/13] | French: | Méthode pour la réduction des oscillations de tension au point neutre d'un onduleur à trois niveaux | [1993/13] | Examination procedure | 22.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/31] | 25.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 29.02.1996 | [1996/30] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP3015273 ; | [A]DE3907940 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [CH]); | [A]DE3842985 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [DE]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 130 (E-1051)29. März 1991 & JP-A-30 15 273 ( HITACHI ) 23. Januar 1991, & JP3015273 A 00000000 | Examination | - Elektrische Bahnen 89 (1991) 11; Seiten 398/82-400/84; A. Weschta: Statische Umformer zur Kupplung von Bahnnetzen und Landesnetzen |