EP0533104 - Aerating nozzle for liquids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.12.1996 [1996/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Anton Steinecker Entwicklungs GmbH & Co. Raiffeisenstrasse 30, Postfach 1853 D-85318 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/12] | For all designated states ANTON STEINECKER ENTWICKLUNGS GmbH & Co. Raiffeisenstrasse 30, Postfach 1853 D-85318 Freising / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Redl, Simon Doktor-Georg-Schranne-Strasse 6 W-8309 Reichertshausen / DE | 02 /
Wiederhold, Johannes Wirtsweg 24 W-8371 Böbrach / DE | [1993/12] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/12] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92115751.7 | 15.09.1992 | [1993/12] | Priority number, date | DE19910011657U | 18.09.1991 Original published format: DE 9111657 U | [1993/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0533104 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0533104 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B01F5/04 | [1993/12] | CPC: |
B01F25/3142 (EP,US);
B01F25/31425 (EP,US);
Y10S261/75 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1993/12] | Title | German: | Belüftungsdüse für Flüssigkeiten | [1993/12] | English: | Aerating nozzle for liquids | [1993/12] | French: | Gicleur d'aération pour liquide | [1993/12] | Examination procedure | 13.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/45] | 10.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP62097631 ; | [X]DE160709 ; | [A]FR971536 ; | [A]FR1369977 (WERKSPOOR NV); | [A]FR2261046 (ERDOELCHEMIE GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0367869 (ETHYL CORP [US]); | [E]WO9204972 (STEINECKER ANTON ENTWICKLUNG [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 307 (C-450)(2754) 7. Oktober 1987 & JP-A-62 097 631 ( HISAO KOJIMA ), & JP62097631 A 00000000 |