EP0533105 - Carbon member having a metal spray coating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.1997 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.12.1997 [1997/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOCALO CO. LTD. 13-4, Fukae-Kitamachi 4-chome, Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo / JP | For all designated states Toyo Tanso Co., Ltd. No. 7-12, Takeshima 5-chome Nishi Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/12] | For all designated states TOCALO CO. LTD. 13-4, Fukae-Kitamachi 4-chome, Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo / JP | ||
For all designated states Toyo Tanso Co., Ltd. No. 7-12, Takeshima 5-chome Nishi Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harada, Yoshio 8-18, Takaoka 1-chome, Ookubo-cho Akashi-shi, Hyogo / JP | 02 /
Takeuchi, Junichi 5-12, Honjo-cho, Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo / JP | 03 /
Tojo, Tetsuro 1-1, Higashi-takenosato-cho 2-chome, Ooharano Nishikyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP | 04 /
Hiraiwa, Jiro 11-10, Nishi-shinsaibashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 05 /
Kuroda, Koji 28-36, Higashi-toyonaka-cho, 1-chome Toyonaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 06 /
Okunishi, Shigeki 32-20, Ooya-cho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo / JP | [1993/12] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/12] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92115753.3 | 15.09.1992 | [1993/12] | Priority number, date | JP19910262566 | 17.09.1991 Original published format: JP 26256691 | [1993/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0533105 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0533105 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C23C4/08, C04B41/51 | [1993/12] | CPC: |
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B41/5133 (EP,US);
C04B41/88 (EP,US);
C23C4/08 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24479 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24521 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24545 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24942 (EP,US);
Y10T428/26 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B35/52 (EP,US);
C04B41/5133, C04B41/4523, C04B41/5346 (US,EP);
C04B41/5133, C04B41/4527, C04B41/53 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/12] | Title | German: | Kohlekörper mit gespritzter Metallschicht | [1996/52] | English: | Carbon member having a metal spray coating | [1993/12] | French: | Corps de carbone avec revêtement métallique appliqué par pulvérisation | [1993/12] |
Former [1993/12] | Kohlekörper mit gespritztem Metallschicht | Examination procedure | 03.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/18] | 07.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1277578 (MORGAN CRUCIBLE CO); | [X]DE2503374 (SCHUNK & EBE GMBH); | [X]DE1962036 (CONRADTY FA C); | [A]US3085317 (STACKHOUSE ROBERT D); | [A]FR1350772 (SNECMA); | [A]FR1481199 (SFEC) |