EP0533198 - Flexible printed substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.1999 [1999/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/12] | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hino, Atsushi, c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Mochizuki, Amane, c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Ouchi, Kazuo, c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP | 04 /
Morita, Shoji, c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP | 05 /
Naito, Toshiki, c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP | 06 /
Higashi, Kazumi, c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP | 07 /
Maeda, Masako, c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP | 08 /
Kaneto, Masayuki, c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP | 09 /
Tanaka, Munekazu, c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP | 10 /
Sugimoto, Masakazu, c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP | [1993/12] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/12] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92116025.5 | 18.09.1992 | [1993/12] | Priority number, date | JP19910268872 | 19.09.1991 Original published format: JP 26887291 | JP19910337556 | 26.11.1991 Original published format: JP 33755691 | JP19910337557 | 26.11.1991 Original published format: JP 33755791 | JP19920097232 | 23.03.1992 Original published format: JP 9723292 | JP19920097233 | 23.03.1992 Original published format: JP 9723392 | JP19920109285 | 01.04.1992 Original published format: JP 10928592 | JP19920121167 | 14.04.1992 Original published format: JP 12116792 | JP19920124174 | 15.04.1992 Original published format: JP 12417492 | JP19920129538 | 21.04.1992 Original published format: JP 12953892 | JP19920160393 | 26.05.1992 Original published format: JP 16039392 | JP19920174671 | 02.06.1992 Original published format: JP 17467192 | JP19920174708 | 08.06.1992 Original published format: JP 17470892 | [1993/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0533198 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0533198 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/03, H05K3/40, H05K3/28, H05K3/46, H05K3/20 | [1995/08] | CPC: |
H05K3/4635 (EP,US);
H05K1/036 (EP,US);
H05K3/205 (EP,US);
H05K3/281 (EP,US);
H05K3/4007 (EP,US);
H05K3/421 (EP,US);
H05K3/4617 (EP,US);
H05K3/4632 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US);
H05K1/0346 (EP,US);
H05K1/0393 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0129 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0154 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0195 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0347 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0355 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0358 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0367 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0394 (EP,US);
H05K2201/068 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09481 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10378 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0152 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0156 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0376 (EP,US);
H05K2203/063 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0726 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0733 (EP,US);
H05K2203/107 (EP,US);
H05K2203/1572 (EP,US);
H05K3/0035 (EP,US);
H05K3/28 (EP,US);
H05K3/423 (EP,US);
H05K3/427 (EP,US);
H05K3/4647 (EP,US);
Y10S428/901 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [1993/12] | H05K1/03, H05K3/40, H05K3/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1993/12] | Title | German: | Biegsamer gedruckter Substrat | [1993/12] | English: | Flexible printed substrate | [1993/12] | French: | Substrat imprimé flexible | [1993/12] | Examination procedure | 29.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/09] | 24.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/26] | 02.02.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH03123093 ; | [A]JPH02168694 ; | [A]JPH02194947 ; | [A]JPH02140991 ; | [A]JPH0218987 ; | [AY]JPS63304690 ; | [Y]JPH03148846 ; | [A]JPS6448492 ; | [A]JPH0245998 ; | [A]USRE26017E (DAHLGREN) [A] 34,43 * column W *; | [Y]US3350250 (SANZ MANUEL C, et al) [Y] 37 * column 4, line 71 - column 5, line 13 *; | [A]GB1126370 (BRITISH AIRCRAFT CORP LTD) [A] 26,27 * figure 2 *; | [A]US3835531 (LUTTMER W) [A] 30 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE2330161 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG) [A] 12,13,19-21,26,27,35,45 * the whole document *; | [Y]US3953924 (ZACHRY CLYDE L, et al) [Y] 26,27,30 * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 42; figure - *; | [A]WO8303944 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [A] 26-28,44 * page 6 - page 7, line 24; figure - *; | [X]EP0192349 (TEKTRONIX INC [US]) [X] 34,36 * page 2, line 23 - line 35; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US4675246 (KUNDINGER ERNST F [DE], et al) [A] 1-3,7,10,11 * example - *; | [XAY]EP0258451 (MEIKO ELECTRONICS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 34,36 * page 21, line 32 - page 27, line 26; figures 3-13 * [A] 43 [Y] 35,37,39,40; | [XA]EP0335337 (NIPPON STEEL CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-3,7-9,11 * page 3, line 5 - line 15 * * page 4, line 24 - line 34 * * page 5, line 57 - page 6, line 24 * [A] 10; | [A]US4961259 (SCHREIBER CHRISTOPHER M [US]) [A] 35,45 * column A *; | [X]WO9014751 (ROGERS CORP [US]) [X] 34,36,38 * figures 3-14 *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910820), vol. 15, no. 326, Database accession no. (E - 1102), & JP03123093 A 00000000 (NIPPON STEEL CHEMICAL CO.) [A] 1,2,10 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 90-242521, & JPH02168694 A 19900628 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEM INC) [A] 1,2,7 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 90-278517, & JPH02194947 A 19900801 (HITACHI CHEMICAL KK) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900817), vol. 14, no. 383, Database accession no. (E - 0966), & JP02140991 A 19900530 (FUJIKURA) [A] 4,31,34,43 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900329), vol. 14, no. 163, Database accession no. (E - 0910), & JP02018987 A 19900123 (HITACHI CHEM CO) [A] 4,31 * abstract * | [AY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890407), vol. 13, no. 142, Database accession no. (E - 739), & JP63304690 A 19881212 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [A] 26,43 * abstract * [Y] 26,27,30 | [A] - M. GREENSTEIN ET AL., "A precision vertical interconnect technology", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMPONENTS,HYBRIDS,AND MANUFACTURING TECHNOLOGY, NEW YORK US, (199109), vol. 14, no. 3, pages 445 - 451, XP000262636 [A] 26-28,35,42,44 * page 445, column R - page 446, column L, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/33.83925 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910920), vol. 15, no. 375, Database accession no. (E - 1114), & JP03148846 A 19910625 (NIPPON MEKTRON) [Y] 35 * abstract * | [Y] - "Bestücken einer Schaltungsplatte mit IC", NEUES AUS DER TECHNIK, WURZBURG DE, (19900710), no. 2, page 4, XP000108063 [Y] 39,40 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890609), vol. 13, no. 248, Database accession no. (E - 770), & JP01048492 A 19890222 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC IND) [A] 4,43,45 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900426), vol. 14, no. 205, Database accession no. (E - 0921), & JP02045998 A 19900215 (HITACHI) [A] 43 * abstract * |