EP0533207 - Multi-focus optical device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.1997 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.05.1997 [1997/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMRON CORPORATION 10, Tsuchido-cho Hanazono Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 616-8025 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/12] | For all designated states OMRON CORPORATION 10, Tsuchido-cho Hanazono Ukyo-ku Kyoto 616 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogata, Shiro 17-304, Sakaidani 2 2-9 Nishisakaidani-cho Oharano Nishikyo-ku Kyoto 610-11 / JP | 02 /
Goto, Hiroshi 1-58-606, Asahimachi Yamatokoriyama-City, Nara, 639-11 / JP | 03 /
Ito, Yoshinori 308, Omron Dobashi Dormitory, 3-10, Dobashi-cho Takatsuki-city, Osaka Pref. / JP | 04 /
Imanaka, Koichi, Nikko Haitsu 101 13-2 Higashi-Kujyo-Aketa-cho, Minami-ku Kyoto 617 / JP | [1993/16] |
Former [1993/12] | 01 /
Ogata, Shiro 3-7, Higashishinbayashi-cho, Ohe Nishigyo-ku Kyoto-city / JP | ||
02 /
Goto, Hiroshi 1-58-606, Asahimachi Yamatokoriyama-City, Nara, 639-11 / JP | |||
03 /
Ito, Yoshinori 308, Omron Dobashi Dormitory, 3-10, Dobashi-cho Takatsuki-city, Osaka Pref. / JP | |||
04 /
Imanaka, Koichi, Nikko Haitsu 101 13-2 Higashi-Kujyo-Aketa-cho, Minami-ku Kyoto 617 / JP | Representative(s) | Kahler, Kurt, et al Patentanwälte Kahler, Käck, Fiener Vorderer Anger 268 86899 Landsberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/45] | Kahler, Kurt, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Kahler, Käck, Fiener et col., Vorderer Anger 268 86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE | ||
Former [1993/12] | Kahler, Kurt, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Kahler, Käck, Fiener & Sturm P.O. Box 12 49 D-87712 Mindelheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 92116136.0 | 21.09.1992 | [1993/12] | Priority number, date | JP19910270358 | 20.09.1991 Original published format: JP 27035891 | JP19910280613 | 30.09.1991 Original published format: JP 28061391 | JP19920130015 | 22.04.1992 Original published format: JP 13001592 | [1993/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0533207 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0533207 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/10, G01D5/26 | [1993/31] | CPC: |
G06K7/10811 (EP,US);
G06K2207/1013 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/12] | G06K7/10, H04N1/028 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/12] | Title | German: | Optisches Gerät mit Multi-Brennweite | [1993/12] | English: | Multi-focus optical device | [1993/12] | French: | Dispositif optique à distance focal multiple | [1993/12] | Examination procedure | 21.10.1992 | Examination requested [1993/12] | 07.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/20] | 19.12.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1996 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0152733 (IBM [US]); | [A]EP0175358 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [Y]EP0249713 (IBM [US]) |