EP0534366 - Acceleration sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.05.1997 [1997/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 226 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/13] | For all designated states MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 226 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamashita, Muneharu 2-26-10, Tenjin Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP | 02 /
Tabota, Jun 2-26-10, Tenjin Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP | 03 /
Mizuno, Toshihiro 2-26-10, Tenjin Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP | 04 /
Inoue, Jiro 2-26-10, Tenjin Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP | [1993/13] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/13] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92116187.3 | 22.09.1992 | [1993/13] | Priority number, date | JP19910243299 | 24.09.1991 Original published format: JP 24329991 | JP19910255284 | 02.10.1991 Original published format: JP 25528491 | JP19910316203 | 29.11.1991 Original published format: JP 31620391 | JP19910346735 | 27.12.1991 Original published format: JP 34673591 | JP19920017627 | 03.02.1992 Original published format: JP 1762792 | [1993/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0534366 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0534366 | Date: | 05.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01P1/00, G01P21/00 | [1993/13] | CPC: |
G01P21/00 (EP,US);
G01P1/006 (EP,US);
G01P1/023 (EP,US);
G01P15/0922 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1993/13] | Title | German: | Beschleunigungsmessaufnehmer | [1993/13] | English: | Acceleration sensor | [1993/13] | French: | Capteur d'accélération | [1993/13] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1996/23: Teilanmeldung 94120004.0 eingereicht am 22/09/92 | EPB 1996/23: Divisional application 94120004.0 filed on 22/09/92 | EPB 1996/23: Demande divisionnaire 94120004.0 déposée le 22/09/92 | Examination procedure | 29.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/26] | 23.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP94120004.0 / EP0646798 | EP94120005.7 / EP0646799 | Opposition(s) | 06.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2239096 (KELLETT MICHAEL A); | [Y]EP0374870 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [AD]FR2550145 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) | Examination | US4700973 |