EP0535548 - Inhibitor of atherosclerotic intimal thickening [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.11.2002 [2002/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. 7-1, 3-chome Kanda-Nishiki-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states Kowa Company, Ltd. 6-29, Nishiki 3-chome, Naka-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 460-8625 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/47] | For all designated states NISSAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. 7-1, 3-chome Kanda-Nishiki-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states KOWA COMPANY LTD. 6-29, Nishiki 3-chome, Naka-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken, 460-8625 / JP | |||
Former [1993/14] | For all designated states NISSAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. 7-1, 3-chome Kanda-Nishiki-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states KOWA COMPANY LTD. 6-29, Nishiki 3-chome Naka-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken, 460 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saito, Yasushi 2-4-24, Katsuragi Chiba-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Kitahara, Masaki, Seibutsukagaku Kenkyusho 1470, Oaza-shiraoka, Shiraoka-machi Minami-saitama-gun, Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Sakashita, Mitsuaki, Seibutsukagaku Kenkyusho 1470, Oaza-shiraoka, Shiraoka-machi Minami-saitama-gun, Saitama-ken / JP | 04 /
Toyoda, Kyomi, Seibutsukagaku Kenkyusho 1470, Oaza-shiraoka, Shiraoka-machi Minami-saitama-gun, Saitama-ken / JP | 05 /
Shibazaki, Toshie, Seibutsukagaku Kenkyusho 1470, Oaza-shiraoka, Shiraoka-machi Minami-saitama-gun, Saitama-ken / JP | [1993/14] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/14] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92116417.4 | 24.09.1992 | [1993/14] | Priority number, date | JP19910257870 | 04.10.1991 Original published format: JP 25787091 | [1993/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0535548 | Date: | 07.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0535548 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/47, A61K31/44 | [1993/14] | CPC: |
A61K31/44 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/47 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/14] | Title | German: | Inhibitor von der atherosklerotischen Intimalerdickung | [1993/14] | English: | Inhibitor of atherosclerotic intimal thickening | [1993/14] | French: | Inhibiteur de l'épaississement atherosclerotique de l'intima | [1993/14] | Examination procedure | 26.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/42] | 08.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 19.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4761419 (PICARD JOSEPH A [US], et al); | [XD]EP0304063 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]); | [X]US4822799 (KATHAWALA FAIZULLA G [US]); | [XD]EP0339358 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]); | [XD]EP0367235 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) | [X] - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY vol. 34, no. 1, January 1991, pages 367 - 373 D.R. SLISKOVIC ET AL. 'INHIBITORS OF CHOLESTEROL BIOSYNTHESIS. 4.' | [A] - JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN COLLEGE OF CARDIOLOGY vol. 17, no. 1, January 1991, pages 251 - 259 GELLMAN J. ET AL 'EFFECT OF LOVASTATIN ON INTIMAL HYPERPLASIA AFTER BALLOON ANGIOPLASTY' | [A] - STN FILE SUPPLIER. MEDLINE AN=91216498 | [A] - PHARMACOLOGY & TOXICOLOGY vol. 64, 1989, pages 173 - 176 P. FALKE ET AL. 'EFFECTS OF A COMPETITIVE INHIBITOR (MEVINOLIN) OF 3-HYDROXY-3-METHYLGLUTARYL COENZYME A REDUCTASE ON HUMAN AND BOVINE ENDOTHELIAL CELLS, FIBROBLASTS AND SMOOTH MUSCLE CELLS IN VITRO' | [A] - 'THE MERCK MANUAL' 1987 , MERCK SHARP & DOHME RESEARCH LABORATORIES , RAHWAY, N.J. |