EP0534475 - Cable loop insert [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 21.08.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.1998 | Opposition rejected | published on 07.10.1998 [1998/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEBR. PHILIPP GmbH Lilienthalstrasse 7 63741 Aschaffenburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/13] | For all designated states GEBR. PHILIPP GmbH Lilienthalstrasse 7 D-63741 Aschaffenburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Philipp, Martin Lilienthalstrasse 7 D-63741 Aschaffenburg / DE | 02 /
Philipp, Hugo Lilienthalstrasse 7 D-63741 Aschaffenburg / DE | [1996/22] |
Former [1993/13] | 01 /
Philipp, Martin Lilienthalstrasse 7 W-8750 Aschaffenburg / DE | ||
02 /
Philipp, Hugo Lilienthalstrasse 7 W-8750 Aschaffenburg / DE | Representative(s) | Jaeger, Klaus, et al propindus Patentanwälte NIEDMERS JAEGER KÖSTER Auguste-Viktoria-Allee 87 13403 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/13] | Jaeger, Klaus, Dr., et al Jaeger, Böck & Köster, Patentanwälte, Postfach 16 20 D-82121 Gauting / DE | Application number, filing date | 92116487.7 | 25.09.1992 | [1993/13] | Priority number, date | DE19914131956 | 25.09.1991 Original published format: DE 4131956 | [1993/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0534475 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0534475 | Date: | 29.05.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | E04G21/14, B28B23/00, E04B1/41 | [1993/13] | CPC: |
B28B23/005 (EP);
E04B1/415 (EP);
E04G21/126 (EP);
E04G21/142 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, NL [1993/13] | Title | German: | Seilschlaufeneinlegeteil | [1993/13] | English: | Cable loop insert | [1993/13] | French: | Pièce d'insertion pour boucle de câble | [1993/13] | Examination procedure | 30.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/47] | 08.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.02.1997
ADMISSIBLE BETOMAX Kunststoff- und Metallwarenfabrik GmbH & Co. KG Dyckhofstrasse 1 D-45133 Essen / DE Opponent's representative Schumacher, Horst Palgen, Schumacher & Kollegen Frühlingstrasse 43A 45133 Essen / DE | [1997/17] | 01.04.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.10.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.04.1998 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1998/41] | 29.04.1998 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.05.1998 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 11.05.1998 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3322646 ; | [Y]DE1684254 ; | [A]DE2525011 ; | [A]DE3127087 ; | [A]DE3629772 ; | [A]US4304431 |