EP0534486 - Direct conversion FSK demodulator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/30] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | ||
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | ||
Former [1993/13] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD 1006-banchi, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mimura, Masahiro 3-9-8, Nishi Ogi Kita Suginami-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Hasegawa, Makoto Kamisoshigaya Haitsu 307, 5-22-14, Kamisoshigaya Setagaya-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Watanabe, Kazunori 608-7-768, Noba-cho, Kounan-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Harada, Hiroyuki Berutopia Kanazawa II-503, 2-3-19, Housai Kanazawa-shi, Ishikawa-ken / JP | [1993/13] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/13] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92116547.8 | 28.09.1992 | [1993/13] | Priority number, date | JP19910248819 | 27.09.1991 Original published format: JP 24881991 | JP19920202168 | 29.07.1992 Original published format: JP 20216892 | [1993/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0534486 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0534486 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0534486 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/14 | [1993/13] | CPC: |
H04L27/1525 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/13] | Title | German: | FSK-Demodulator mit direkter Umwandlung | [1998/30] | English: | Direct conversion FSK demodulator | [1993/13] | French: | Démodulateur FSK à conversion directe | [1993/13] |
Former [1993/13] | Direktmisch FSK-Demodulator | Examination procedure | 28.09.1992 | Examination requested [1993/13] | 31.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 22.07.1998 | [2004/35] |
Former [1999/22] | FR | 18.12.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]WO8603643 (INDUSTRIEORIENTIERTE FORSCH [CH]) [X] 1-3,15-18,35,36 * abstract * * page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 16 * * page 8, line 17 - line 33 * * page 9, line 6 - page 10, line 9 * * page 11, line 5 - line 23 * * figure - * [A] 19-34 [Y] 4-9; | [XAY]EP0151334 (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD [GB]) [X] 10-14 * abstract * * page 3, line 20 - line 24 * * page 3, line 31 - page 4, line 14 * * figures 1-4 * [A] 19-34 [Y] 4-9; | [A]EP0429948 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-36 * abstract * * column 11, line 41 - line 57 * * figures 1-3 * |