EP0539738 - Sealing tape for wrapping a cable to be led through a cable entrance opening, particularly a telecommunications cable or similar round material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.01.1996 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.1996 | Refusal of application | published on 06.03.1996 [1996/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stewing Kunststoffbetrieb GmbH Dorsten i.K. Barbarastrasse 50 46282 Dorsten / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/18] | For all designated states STEWING KUNSTSTOFFBETRIEB GmbH Barbarastrasse 50 D-46282 Dorsten / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dehling, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Winkelkamp 5 W-4270 Dorsten 11 / DE | [1993/18] | Representative(s) | Honke, Manfred, et al Patentanwälte Andrejewski, Honke & Sozien, Postfach 10 02 54 45002 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/18] | Honke, Manfred, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Andrejewski, Honke & Partner, Postfach 10 02 54 D-45002 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 92116599.9 | 29.09.1992 | [1993/18] | Priority number, date | DE19914135570 | 29.10.1991 Original published format: DE 4135570 | [1993/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0539738 | Date: | 05.05.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0539738 | Date: | 27.10.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H02G15/013, H02G15/007 | [1993/18] | CPC: |
H02G15/007 (EP,US);
H02G15/013 (EP,US);
Y10T428/22 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24289 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24331 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24413 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/18] | Title | German: | Dichtungsband zum Umwickeln eines durch eine Kabeldurchtrittsöffnung hindurchzuführenden Kabels, insbesondere Fernmeldekabels o. dgl. Rundmaterial | [1993/18] | English: | Sealing tape for wrapping a cable to be led through a cable entrance opening, particularly a telecommunications cable or similar round material | [1993/18] | French: | Ruban d'étanchéité pour envelopper un câble à traverser une ouverture d'entrée de câble, en particulier un câble de télécommunication ou matériau rond semblable | [1993/18] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 21.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/18] | 30.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1996/10] | 19.10.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1996/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1995 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2005307 ; | [X]DE2832485 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]US4501927 (SIEVERT JAMES A [US]); | [A]EP0173576 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]); | [X]EP0206854 (MOREL ATEL ELECTROMEC [FR]); | [A]EP0316911 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]); | [AD]DE9107914U |