EP0537576 - A slider for a slide fastener and its manufacturing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YKK Corporation No. 1, Kanda Izumi-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/49] | For all designated states YKK CORPORATION No. 1, Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1993/16] | For all designated states YOSHIDA KOGYO K.K. No. 1 Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keyaki, Keiichi 4016, Mikkaichi Kurobe-shi, Toyama-ken / JP | 02 /
Ichikawa, Nobuhiro 11, Tubokawashin Namerikawa-shi, Toyama-ken / JP | [1993/16] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/16] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7/II Aufg. D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92116933.0 | 02.10.1992 | [1993/16] | Priority number, date | JP19910292487 | 11.10.1991 Original published format: JP 29248791 | [1993/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0537576 | Date: | 21.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0537576 | Date: | 08.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A44B19/26 | [1993/16] | CPC: |
A44B19/26 (EP,US);
B21K25/00 (EP,US);
Y10T24/2588 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/16] | Title | German: | Reissverschlussschieber und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [1993/16] | English: | A slider for a slide fastener and its manufacturing method | [1993/16] | French: | Curseur pour fermeture à glissière et son procédé de fabrication | [1993/16] | Examination procedure | 26.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/38] | 17.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3111738 (BAIR HERBERT Q); | [X]FR2021982 (PRYM WERKE WILLIAM); | [A]EP0097362 (YOSHIDA KOGYO KK [JP]); | [A]US5007144 (TERADA YASUHARU [JP], et al) |