EP0552416 - Direct current electromagnetic actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.06.1995 [1995/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Binder Magnete GmbH Mönchweiler Strasse 1 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/30] | For all designated states Binder Magnete GmbH Mönchweiler Strasse 1 D-78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Freitag, Heinz Fohrenweg 22 W-7731 Unterkirnach / DE | 02 /
Richl, Helmut Am Mühlweiher 5 W-7951 Tannheim / DE | 03 /
Ketterer, Wolfgang Feldbergweg 9 W-7730 Villingen / DE | 04 /
Knöbel, Wolfgang Holzsteigweg 2 W-7710 Donaueschingen / DE | 05 /
Geyer, Alfred Adlerring 18 W-7730 Villingen / DE | 06 /
Oesterle, Hans-Peter Lupfen 33 W-7201 Tuningen / DE | [1993/30] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/30] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Buchner, Mussgnug Neunert, Göhring Waldstrasse 33 D-78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 92117176.5 | 08.10.1992 | [1993/30] | Priority number, date | DE19920000549U | 18.01.1992 Original published format: DE 9200549 U | [1993/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0552416 | Date: | 28.07.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01F7/08 | [1993/30] | CPC: |
H01F7/1607 (EP);
H01F7/081 (EP);
H01F2007/085 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1993/30] | Title | German: | Gleichstrom-Hubmagnet | [1993/30] | English: | Direct current electromagnetic actuator | [1993/30] | French: | Electro-aimant de commande à courant continu | [1993/30] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 29.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/04] | 19.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/26] | 31.01.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1994 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3105652 ; | [X]DE3243999 ; | [A]EP0146951 ; | [A]GB2014795 ; | [A]FR2545574 ; | [A]US4368446 ; | [A]DE3705805 ; | [A]DE4041416 ; | [A]US3050663 ; | [A]DE2022584 ; | [A]DE2710645 |