EP0545034 - Motor driven power steering [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.1994 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.1995 [1995/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/23] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schlagmueller, Walter, Ing. Frankenstrasse 39 W-7141 Schwieberdingen / DE | [1993/23] | Application number, filing date | 92117266.4 | 09.10.1992 | [1993/23] | Priority number, date | DE19914139558 | 30.11.1991 Original published format: DE 4139558 | [1993/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0545034 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0545034 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/04 | [1993/23] | CPC: |
B62D5/043 (EP);
F16D3/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1993/23] | Title | German: | Elektromotorische Servolenkung | [1993/23] | English: | Motor driven power steering | [1993/23] | French: | Direction assistée à moteur électronique | [1993/23] | File destroyed: | 03.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 04.05.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/02] | 18.08.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1995/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9105692 ; | [A]DE4109920 ; | [A]DE2925156 |