blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0543135

EP0543135 - Selective white liquor oxidation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC.
7201 Hamilton Boulevard
Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US
[1993/21]
Inventor(s)01 / Magnotta, Vincent Louis
5321 Celia Drive
Wescosville, PA 18106 / US
02 / Naddeo, Ronald Charles
Mountain School, R.D. No.2
Kempton, PA 19529 / US
03 / Ayala, Varin
101 Race Street, Apt, No.110
Catasauqua, Pa 18032 / US
04 / Cirucci, John Frederick
2027 Girard Avenue
Allentown, PA 18104 / US
05 / Fox, Virgil Grant
4102 Kilmer Avenue
Allentown, PA 18104 / US
[1993/21]
Representative(s)Kador & Partner Part mbB
Corneliusstraße 15
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1993/21]Kador & Partner
Corneliusstrasse 15
D-80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date92117320.909.10.1992
[1993/21]
Priority number, dateUS1991078068118.10.1991         Original published format: US 780681
[1993/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0543135
Date:26.05.1993
Language:EN
[1993/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0543135
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.03.1993
ClassificationIPC:D21C11/00
[1993/21]
CPC:
D21C11/0071 (EP,US); D21C11/0057 (EP,US); Y10S423/03 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   FR,   LU,   SE [1993/21]
TitleGerman:Selektive Oxydation von Weisslauge[1993/21]
English:Selective white liquor oxidation[1993/21]
French:Oxydation sélective de liqueur blanche[1993/21]
Examination procedure19.10.1993Examination requested  [1993/50]
04.10.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.10.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.02.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.11.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.07.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
14.02.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
11.04.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.03.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
04.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.01.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.10.1999Fee for grant paid
19.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
09.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
14.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
13.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
08.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
15.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.01.2000
BE26.01.2000
LU09.10.2000
[2004/39]
Former [2001/08]AT26.01.2000
BE26.01.2000
Documents cited:Search[AD]US4053352  (HULTMAN BENGT GORAN, et al);
 [A]US4299652  (MASUNO KOUJI, et al);
 [AP]US5143702  (DER BRUCE [CA], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.